Hampton v. Bohlke et al
Plaintiff: Willie Hampton
Defendant: Thomas J. Bohlke and James E. Rambo
Case Number: 3:2019cv00106
Filed: May 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/14/19. (cr)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 7/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 6/13/19. (cr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Willie Hampton. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (cr)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT AND CERTIFICATION TO CONTINUE LAWSUIT. (cr)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 6/17/2019. Signed by Clerk on 5/17/19. (cr)
May 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P. Mills and Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (cr)
May 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Willie Hampton. (cr)
May 17, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement, Jury Demand, filed by Willie Hampton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hampton v. Bohlke et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas J. Bohlke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Rambo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie Hampton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?