United States of America v. An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 2.43 Acres of Land, More or Less, In Yalobusha County, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Will Horton and An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 2.43 Acres of Land, More or Less, In Yalobusha County, Mississippi
Case Number: 3:2019cv00110
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 28:1358
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Complaint (Doc. 1) and Attachments 1 and 2 thereto (Docs. 1-1 and 1-2); Notice of Condemnation (Doc. 2) and Attachment 1 thereto (Doc. 2-1); Declaration of Taking (Doc. 3) and Attachments thereto (Docs. 3-1 and 3-2); Notice of Filing of Declaration of Taking (Doc. 4) and Attachments 1, 2 and 3 thereto (Docs. 4-1, 4-2 and 4-3); Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession (Doc. 6), Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession (Doc. 7); and June 5, 2019 Email to Judge Brown (attaching Proposed Order of Possession) by James S. Chase on behalf of United States of America to Will Horton. (Chase, James)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed on Will Horton Acknowledgment filed by United States of America. (Chase, James)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion for immediate possession. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 6/28/19. (tab)
June 5, 2019 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION For Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession . (Bernier, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION For Entry of an Order of Immediate Possession by United States of America. (Bernier, Michael)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 Remark: Letter of introduction of James S. Chase and Mark A. Mohr as counsel for the United States of America. (jtm)
May 30, 2019 DEPOSIT of TVA Funds in the amount of $ 4,550, Receipt Number MSN300024147. (edc)
May 29, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING OF DECLARATION OF TAKING by Michael Vincent Bernier, James S. Chase on behalf of United States of America #1 Exhibit 1 Declaration of Taking, #2 Exhibit 2 Land Description, #3 Exhibit 3 Map) (tab).
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Taking filed by Plaintiff. (tab) #1 Exhibit 1 Land Description, #2 Exhibit 2 Map) (tab).
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION, filed by United States of America. (tab) #1 Exhibit 1 Property Description) (tab).
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT,, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Tract No. OWVTC-68, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 2.43 Acres of Land, More or Less, In Yalobusha County, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Will Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: An Easement and Right-of-Way Over 2.43 Acres of Land, More or Less, In Yalobusha County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Michael Vincent Bernier
Represented By: James S. Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?