Volvo Group North America, LLC v. International Union United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America et al
Plaintiff: Volvo Group North America, LLC
Defendant: UAW Local No. 2406 and International Union United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00119
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; UAW Local No. 2406 waiver sent on 7/24/2019. (Wallace, Michael)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Samuel Morris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/25/19. (bnd)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Andrew D. Roth. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/25/19. (bnd)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Timothy P. Taylor. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/25/19. (bnd)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Timothy Paul Taylor,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1702058) by International Union United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, UAW Local No. 2406. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Laurenzi, Eugene)
July 23, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Samuel Morris,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1702056) by International Union United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, UAW Local No. 2406. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Indiana), #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (Tennessee)) (Laurenzi, Eugene)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Andrew D. Roth,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1702048) by International Union United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, UAW Local No. 2406. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing (A. Roth)) (Laurenzi, Eugene)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael B. Wallace on behalf of Volvo Group North America, LLC International Union United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America served on 6/19/2019. (Wallace, Michael)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jennifer H. Scott on behalf of Volvo Group North America, LLC (Scott, Jennifer)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/2/19. (bnd)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 9/3/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/2/19. (rtc)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by International Union United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America, UAW Local No. 2406. (Laurenzi, Eugene)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Returned to attorney for service. (jwr)
June 5, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1686765, filed by Volvo Group North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Volvo Group North America, LLC v. International Union United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Volvo Group North America, LLC
Represented By: Michael B. Wallace
Represented By: Jennifer H. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UAW Local No. 2406
Represented By: Timothy Taylor
Represented By: Eugene A. Laurenzi
Represented By: Samuel Morris
Represented By: Andrew D. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Union United Automobile Aerospace and Agricultural Implement Workers of America
Represented By: Timothy Taylor
Represented By: Eugene A. Laurenzi
Represented By: Samuel Morris
Represented By: Andrew D. Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?