Hom v. Shoney's Mississippi LLC et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Edward Hom
Defendant: Shoney's Mississippi LLC and Shoney's USA LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00121
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 8/26/2019 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 8/15/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/15/19. (rtc)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Shoney's USA LLC. (Wright, Thomas)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Shoney's Mississippi LLC. (Wright, Thomas)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry C. Shelton, III on behalf of Thomas Edward Hom All Defendants served on 6/14/2019. (Shelton, Henry) Modified on 6/18/2019 (jtm).
June 6, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1687337, filed by Thomas Edward Hom. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hom v. Shoney's Mississippi LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Edward Hom
Represented By: Henry C. Shelton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoney's Mississippi LLC
Represented By: Thomas McIlwain Wright, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shoney's USA LLC
Represented By: Thomas McIlwain Wright, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?