Cullen v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Michael Cullen
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00126
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Philip Andrew Stroud on behalf of Michael Cullen to Cory L. Radicioni, Esq.. (Stroud, Philip)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philip Andrew Stroud on behalf of Michael Cullen Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company served on 7/2/2019. (Stroud, Philip)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David E. Rozier, Jr on behalf of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Rozier, David)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jenessa Carter Hicks on behalf of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Hicks, Jenessa)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 8/29/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/17/19. (rtc)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Radicioni, Cory)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Radicioni, Cory)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company (jla)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael P Mills and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. E-mailed to attorney for service. (tab)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number MSN30001689872, filed by Michael Cullen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cullen v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: David E. Rozier, Jr.
Represented By: Jenessa Carter Hicks
Represented By: Cory L. Radicioni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cullen
Represented By: Philip Andrew Stroud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?