Linares et al v. City of Southaven et al
Plaintiff: Edward T. Autry and Claudia Linares
Defendant: John Does 1-25, City of Southaven, Officer Samuel Maze, Officer Zachary Durden and Steve Pirtle
Case Number: 3:2019cv00133
Filed: June 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael S. Carr on behalf of Claudia Linares City of Southaven served on 8/14/2019. (Carr, Michael)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER STAYING CASE due to #5 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/15/19. (cs)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 BRIEF re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Lack of Standing, and/or on Sovereign Immunity . (Kerby, Katherine)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , Lack of Standing, and/or on Sovereign Immunity by Zachary Durden. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 record on Ismael Lopez, #2 Exhibit 2 DeSoto County certified copy of court file, #3 Exhibit 3 City of Horn Lake, MS records, #4 Exhibit 4 parentage record, #5 Exhibit 5 Rodolfo Linares record) (Kerby, Katherine)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to City of Southaven, Steve Pirtle, and Samuel Mize (jla)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael S. Carr on behalf of Claudia Linares, Edward T. Autry Zachary Durden served on 7/24/2019. (Carr, Michael)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to City of Southaven, Zachary Durden, Samuel Maze, Steve Pirtle. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1691514, filed by Claudia Linares, Edward T. Autry. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Linares et al v. City of Southaven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward T. Autry
Represented By: Michael S. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Linares
Represented By: Michael S. Carr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Southaven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Samuel Maze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Zachary Durden
Represented By: Katherine S. Kerby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Pirtle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?