Snow v. C.C. Clark, Inc.
Plaintiff: Devin Snow
Defendant: C.C. Clark, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00143
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 9/24/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 9/10/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/26/19. (rtc)
July 25, 2019 Filing 5 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Carpenter, Thomas)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by C.C. Clark, Inc.. (Carpenter, Thomas)
July 16, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Shane McLaughlin on behalf of Devin Snow C.C. Clark, Inc. served on 7/9/2019. (McLaughlin, Richard)
June 28, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to C.C. Clark, Inc.; forwarded to Attorney for service. (jla)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1694779, filed by Devin Snow. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit B - Right to Sue, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snow v. C.C. Clark, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.C. Clark, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Lynn Carpenter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devin Snow
Represented By: Richard Shane McLaughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?