Fields v. Hininger

Plaintiff: Jacoby G Fields and Jacoby Germaine Fields
Defendant: Damon T Hininger
Case Number: 3:2019cv00147
Filed: July 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER requiring Plaintiff to Complete and Return In Forma Pauperis Application. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 7/8/19. (jla)
July 8, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
July 8, 2019 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of South Carolina; Case Number 5:19-cv-01632. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #13 Order on Report and Recommendation w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail from Florence Clerk's Office to Jacoby G Fields, #349115, Tallahatchie County Correctional Institution, 415 US Hwy 49 North, Tutwiler, MS 38963. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/8/2019.]
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER affirming #9 Report and Recommendation, transferring case to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi for further handling including any further initial review. Signed by Honorable David C Norton on 7/3/2019.(eric, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/8/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 ***DOCUMENT MAILED: #9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION w/NEF, placed in U.S. Mail to Jacoby G Fields, #349115, Tallahatchie County Correctional Institution, 415 US Hwy 49 North, Tutwiler, MS 38963. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/8/2019.]
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION: The undersigned recommends this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi for further handling including any further initial review. Objections to R&R due by 6/25/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kaymani D West on 6/11/2019. (prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/8/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Restricted Access) by Jacoby G Fields. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)No proposed order.Motions referred to Kaymani D West.(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/8/2019.]
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Damon T Hininger, filed by Jacoby G Fields. Service due by 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(prou, ) [Transferred from South Carolina on 7/8/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fields v. Hininger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacoby G Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacoby Germaine Fields
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon T Hininger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?