Long et al v. Dent et al
Plaintiff: Jimmy Long and Mary Long
Defendant: Deairrious Dent, XYZ Corporations 1-3, WMSC Transportation, LLC and John Does 1-3
Case Number: 3:2019cv00149
Filed: July 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to First Set of Request for Production by Oliver Earl Clark, Jr on behalf of Jimmy Long, Mary Long to Defendants. (Clark, Oliver)
August 22, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Response to Interrogatories by Oliver Earl Clark, Jr on behalf of Jimmy Long, Mary Long to Defendants. (Clark, Oliver)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/21/19. (irw)
August 21, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)
August 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 10/5/2020 09:30 AM in Oxford Courtroom 1 before Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. (mga)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 2/14/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 9/30/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 11/14/2019. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 12/13/2019. Motions due by 3/6/2020. Settlement Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/16/19. (irw)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Oliver Earl Clark, Jr on behalf of Jimmy Long, Mary Long to Defendant. (Clark, Oliver)
August 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Conference: Settlement Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (irw)
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 8/9/2019. (irw)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by R. Jeff Allen on behalf of Deairrious Dent, WMSC Transportation, LLC to All Counsel. (Allen, R.)
July 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of discovery requests by R. Jeff Allen on behalf of Deairrious Dent, WMSC Transportation, LLC to All Counsel. (Allen, R.)
July 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of responses to written discovery by R. Jeff Allen on behalf of Deairrious Dent to All Counsel. (Allen, R.)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Clerk, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit summons - WMSC Transportation, LLC, #4 Exhibit Summons - Dent, #5 Exhibit State court orders, #6 Exhibit Notice of Service - discovery) (Allen, R.)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE of responses to Requests for Admissions by R. Jeff Allen on behalf of Deairrious Dent, WMSC Transportation, LLC to All Counsel. (Allen, R.)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 8/9/2019 at 03:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 7/12/19. (irw)
July 11, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Deairrious Dent, WMSC Transportation, LLC. (Allen, R.)
July 9, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
July 9, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jimmy Long, Mary Long. (jwr)
July 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by WMSC Transportation, LLC, Deairrious Dent from Circuit Court of Quitman County, Mississippi, case number 2019-0027. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1697475) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by WMSC Transportation, LLC, Deairrious Dent. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long et al v. Dent et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Long
Represented By: Oliver Earl Clark, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Long
Represented By: Oliver Earl Clark, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deairrious Dent
Represented By: R. Jeff Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corporations 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WMSC Transportation, LLC
Represented By: R. Jeff Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?