Rademacher et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Robert Andrew Perry and Kurt Rademacher
Defendant: John Does 1-5, United States Department of Transportation, United States of America and Federal Aviation Administration
Case Number: 3:2019cv00157
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Tom S Lee
Referring Judge: Michael P Mills
2 Judge: Roy Percy
3 Judge: Robert H Walker
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Benjamin M. Watson on behalf of Kurt Rademacher, Robert Andrew Perry United States of America served on 8/5/2019. (Watson, Benjamin)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Sharion Aycock, Magistrate Judge Roy Percy recused. Case reassigned to Tom S. Lee and Magistrate Judge Robert H. Walker for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 8/13/19. (jtm)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Shelton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shelton, David)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Michael P. Mills recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Sharion Aycock for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 07/29/2019. (jwr)
July 24, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Federal Aviation Administration, United States Department of Transportation, United States of America. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1702365, filed by Kurt Rademacher, Robert Andrew Perry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - National Transportation Safety Board Factual Report, #2 Exhibit 2 - NTSB Probable Cause, #3 Exhibit 3 - Report of Richard P. Burgess, #4 Exhibit 4 - Federal Aviation Administrations administrative denial letter, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rademacher et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Andrew Perry
Represented By: Benjamin M. Watson
Represented By: David Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt Rademacher
Represented By: Benjamin M. Watson
Represented By: David Shelton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Transportation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Aviation Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?