Brown v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Plaintiff: Barbara Brown
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00178
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Simpkins, Kelly)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, . (Simpkins, Kelly)
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin A. Rogers on behalf of Guardian Life Insurance Company of America (Rogers, Kevin)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/8/19. (irw)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 9:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before District Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 3 days) (spw)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/2/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 5/21/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 11/29/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 2/20/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 3/20/2020. Motions due by 6/15/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/7/19. (irw)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 10/4/2019. (irw)
September 5, 2019 NOTICE of Conference: #4 Case Management Conference RESET for 10/4/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (irw)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint, filed in the Circuit Court of Calhoun County, Mississippi, by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (jtm)
August 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 9/30/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/29/19. (irw)
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Kelly D. Simpkins on behalf of Guardian Life Insurance Company of America re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, Notice and Certificate of Filing State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Case Cover, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Notice of Assignment, #4 Exhibit Summons, #5 Exhibit Answer and Notice of Disc Resp, #6 Exhibit Notice of Def RFA to Plaintiff, #7 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss part 1, #8 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss part 2, #9 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss part 3, #10 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss part 4, #11 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss part 5, #12 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss part 6, #13 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss part 7, #14 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss part 8, #15 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss part 9, #16 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss part 10, #17 Exhibit Memo ISO Motion to Dismiss, #18 Exhibit Notice of Hearing, #19 Exhibit Notice of Service of Discovery, #20 Exhibit Memo in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #21 Exhibit Motion to Hold Pending Motion in Abeyance, #22 Exhibit Resp and Opposition to Mtn to Hold in Abeyance, #23 Exhibit Def Reply ISO Motion to Dismiss, #24 Exhibit Order Denying Motion to Dismiss, #25 Exhibit Notice of Deposition, #26 Exhibit Notice of Service of 2nd Set of Disc, #27 Exhibit Notice to Clerk of Removal) (Simpkins, Kelly)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, filed by Barbara Brown. (jwr)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America from Circuit Court of Calhoun County, case number CV2018-000054. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1709630) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Guardian Life Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition Excerpts, #2 Exhibit Circuit Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit Circuit Court Summons, #4 Exhibit Proof of Service, #5 Exhibit Answer, #6 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss ("MTD"), #7 Exhibit Exhibit to MTD part 1, #8 Exhibit Exhibit to MTD part 2, #9 Exhibit Exhibit to MTD part 3, #10 Exhibit Served Pleadings and Circuit Court Filings, #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Kelly D. Simpkins
Represented By: Kevin A. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Brown
Represented By: Sarah Lynn Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?