Nunnery v. Sam's East, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tawana Nunnery
Defendant: John Doe Manager, Sam's East, Inc. and John Doe Maintenance
Case Number: 3:2019cv00179
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE of FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES, REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, AND REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION by Juan T. Williams on behalf of Tawana Nunnery to SAMS EAST, INC.. (Williams, Juan)
October 7, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Sam's East, Inc. to Plaintiff. (Louis, Thomas)
September 30, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Supplemental Pre-Discovery Disclosures of Core Information by Dorissa S. Smith on behalf of Sam's East, Inc. to Counsel for Plaintiff. (Smith, Dorissa)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/25/19. (irw)
September 25, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)
September 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 09:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before District Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 4 days) (spw)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 4/23/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 11/6/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 1/24/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 2/24/2020. Motions due by 5/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/23/19. (irw)
September 23, 2019 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 9/23/2019. (irw)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/23/19. (bfg)
September 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production by Juan T. Williams on behalf of Tawana Nunnery to Sam's East. (Williams, Juan) Modified on 9/18/2019 (jla).
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pre-Discovery Disclosures of Core Information by Dorissa S. Smith on behalf of Sam's East, Inc. to Counsel for Plaintiff. (Smith, Dorissa)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 9/23/2019 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden.Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/22/19. (irw)
August 22, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Sam's East, Inc.. (Louis, Thomas)
August 22, 2019 Filing 3 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil case docket, #2 State Court Complaint Complaint, #3 Summons Summons issued to Sam's East, #4 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Smith, Dorissa)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Tawana Nunnery. (jwr)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sam's East, Inc. from Circuit Court of Desoto County, case number CI2019-349. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1709736) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Sam's East, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - Copies of process, pleadings, etc. served on Sam's, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nunnery v. Sam's East, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tawana Nunnery
Represented By: Juan T. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Manager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's East, Inc.
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Maintenance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?