Jones et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al
Plaintiff: Marvin Jones and Valerie Jones
Defendant: HSBC Bank, National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association and John Does 1-5
Case Number: 3:2019cv00188
Filed: August 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Christopher D. Meyer on behalf of HSBC Bank, National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association to Plaintiffs. (Meyer, Christopher)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Daniel Marten Czamanske, Jr on behalf of Marvin Jones, Valerie Jones to Defendants. (Czamanske, Daniel)
October 3, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Circuit Court Clerk, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons Issued to HSBC, #4 Exhibit 4 - Proof of Service on Wells Fargo Bank, #5 Exhibit 5 - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Proof of Service on HSBC) (Meyer, Christopher)
October 1, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal; Please file State Court Record pursuant to red docket text (jla)
September 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 10/23/2019 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
August 30, 2019 Filing 5 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by HSBC Bank, National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Meyer, Christopher)
August 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by HSBC Bank, National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Meyer, Christopher)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 10/17/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/26/19. (rtc)
August 23, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
August 23, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Marvin Jones, Valerie Jones. (jwr)
August 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by HSBC Bank, National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association from Circuit Court of Tallahatchie, Mississippi, case number CV-2019-0014. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1712527) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by HSBC Bank, National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, National Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Jones
Represented By: Daniel Marten Czamanske, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valerie Jones
Represented By: Daniel Marten Czamanske, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank, National Association
Represented By: Christopher D. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Christopher D. Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?