Davis v. North Mississippi Regional Center
Plaintiff: Eddie Harold (Hal) Davis, Jr.
Defendant: North Mississippi Regional Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv00191
Filed: August 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 11/19/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/15/19. (rtc)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by North Mississippi Regional Center. (May, Benny)
October 7, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Eddie Harold (Hal) Davis, Jr North Mississippi Regional Center served on 9/17/2019. (Waide, Jim)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to North Mississippi Regional Center (jla)
August 26, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
August 26, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to North Mississippi Regional Center. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
August 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1713031, filed by Eddie Harold (Hal) Davis, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: EEOC Charge, #2 Exhibit B: Right to Sue Letter, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. North Mississippi Regional Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eddie Harold (Hal) Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Jim D. Waide, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North Mississippi Regional Center
Represented By: Benny McCalip May
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?