Ohio Security Insurance Company v. Finley et al
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Defendant: David Dyer, Elizabeth Finley, COFC Logistics, LLC, Jamac Logistics, LLC, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Interpool, Inc., Cornerstone Systems, Inc. and Great West Casualty Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00197
Filed: August 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures of COFC Logistics, LLC by Hal Scot Spragins, Jr on behalf of COFC Logistics, LLC to All Counsel. (Spragins, Hal)
October 28, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by James M. Simpson on behalf of Jamac Logistics, LLC to All Counsel. (Simpson, James)
October 28, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Disclosures of Core Information by Clifford K. Bailey, III on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Company to All Counsel. (Bailey, Clifford)
October 28, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1) by William Grant Armistead on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company to All Counsel. (Armistead, William)
October 11, 2019 Filing 34 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Armistead, William)
October 9, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifford K. Bailey, III on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Company David Dyer served on 10/1/2019. (Bailey, Clifford)
October 7, 2019 Filing 32 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Interpool, Inc. (jla)
October 7, 2019 Filing 31 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to David Dyer (jla)
October 1, 2019 Filing 30 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Cornerstone Systems, Inc.. (Tatum, Patrick)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company answer due 10/15/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/30/19. (bfg)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. COFC Logistics, LLC answer due 10/14/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/30/19. (bfg)
September 30, 2019 Filing 27 CORPORATE STATEMENT of COFC. (Spragins, Hal)
September 30, 2019 Filing 26 COFC Logistics ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by COFC Logistics, LLC. (Spragins, Hal)
September 30, 2019 Filing 25 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Jamac Logistics, LLC. (Simpson, James)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Peter J. Kestner is hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Defendant Elizabeth Finley. Newly admitted counsel shall register as a user of the court's electronic filing system by October 5, 2019 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/30/19. (bfg)(no document attached)
September 27, 2019 Filing 24 EXHIBIT re #21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Peter J. Kestner,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1723894) . (Lott, Casey)
September 27, 2019 Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Great West Casualty Company. (Berry, Michael)
September 27, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Garner Berry on behalf of Great West Casualty Company (Berry, Michael)
September 27, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Peter J. Kestner,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1723894) by Elizabeth Finley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Lott, Casey)
September 27, 2019 Filing 20 CORPORATE STATEMENT Nationwide. (Armistead, William)
September 27, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company. (Armistead, William)
September 27, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by William Grant Armistead on behalf of Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company (Armistead, William)
September 26, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by COFC Logistics, LLC. (Spragins, Hal)
September 26, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Hal Scot Spragins, Jr on behalf of COFC Logistics, LLC (Spragins, Hal)
September 25, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Jamac Logistics, LLC. (Simpson, James)
September 25, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James M. Simpson on behalf of Jamac Logistics, LLC (Simpson, James)
September 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference RESET for 11/4/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 14 days prior to the conference. (irw)
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifford K. Bailey, III on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Company Elizabeth Finley served on 9/11/2019. (Bailey, Clifford)
September 18, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifford K. Bailey, III on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Company Interpool, Inc. served on 9/9/2019. (Bailey, Clifford)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifford K. Bailey, III on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Company COFC Logistics, LLC served on 9/9/2019. (Bailey, Clifford)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 10/16/2019 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/18/19. (irw)
September 18, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, (Answer and Defenses of Defendant, Elizabeth Finley, Administratrix of the Estate of Thomas Finley) by Elizabeth Finley. (Lott, Casey)
September 10, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Bailey, Clifford)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifford K. Bailey, III on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Company Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company served on 9/6/2019. (Bailey, Clifford)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifford K. Bailey, III on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Company Jamac Logistics, LLC served on 9/6/2019. (Bailey, Clifford)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifford K. Bailey, III on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Company Great West Casualty Company served on 9/6/2019. (Bailey, Clifford)
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Clifford K. Bailey, III on behalf of Ohio Security Insurance Company Cornerstone Systems, Inc. served on 9/6/2019. (Bailey, Clifford)
August 30, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
August 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1714962, filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Agreement between Trac & COFC, #2 Exhibit B - Agreement between COFC & Cornerstone, #3 Exhibit C - Agreement between Cornerstone & Jamac, #4 Exhibit D - Agreement between Trac & Jamac, #5 Exhibit E - Lease Purchase Agreement between Jamac & Dyer, #6 Exhibit F - Independent Contractor and Equipment Lease Contract between Jamac &, #7 Exhibit G - Great West Policy (Jamac), #8 Exhibit H - Nationwide Policy (Cornerstone), #9 Exhibit I - Ohio Security Policy (COFC), #10 Exhibit J - First Amended Complaint (CA No. 3.18-cv-0078-DMB-JMV), #11 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohio Security Insurance Company v. Finley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Finley
Represented By: Peter J. Kestner
Represented By: Casey Langston Lott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COFC Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Hal Scot Spragins, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamac Logistics, LLC
Represented By: James M. Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: William Grant Armistead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interpool, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cornerstone Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Marvin Tatum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great West Casualty Company
Represented By: Michael Garner Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Clifford K. Bailey, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?