Groner et al v. Yalobusha Health Services et al
Plaintiff: George H. Beam, Jr., Ronald W. Stark, Regina Groner and Jeffrey Swindle
Defendant: Yalobusha Health Services and Yalobusha General Hospital and Nursing Home
Case Number: 3:2019cv00201
Filed: September 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1. Case Management Conference set for 11/18/2019 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/4/19. (rtc)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Yalobusha General Hospital and Nursing Home, Yalobusha Health Services. (Jackson, Russell)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James David Harper on behalf of Ronald W. Stark, Regina Groner, Jeffrey Swindle, George H. Beam, Jr Yalobusha General Hospital and Nursing Home served on 9/16/2019. (Harper, James)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James David Harper on behalf of Ronald W. Stark, Regina Groner, Jeffrey Swindle, George H. Beam, Jr Yalobusha Health Services served on 9/13/2019. (Harper, James)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by James David Harper on behalf of Ronald W. Stark, Regina Groner, Jeffrey Swindle, George H. Beam, Jr Yalobusha General Hospital and Nursing Home served on 9/13/2019. (Harper, James)
September 5, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
September 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1716462, filed by Ronald W. Stark, Regina Groner, Jeffrey Swindle, George H. Beam, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Groner Opt In Consent Form, #2 Exhibit B - Swindle Opt In Consent Form, #3 Exhibit C - Beam Opt In Consent Form, #4 Exhibit D - Stark Opt In Consent Form, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Groner et al v. Yalobusha Health Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George H. Beam, Jr.
Represented By: James David Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald W. Stark
Represented By: James David Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Groner
Represented By: James David Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Swindle
Represented By: James David Harper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yalobusha Health Services
Represented By: Russell W. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yalobusha General Hospital and Nursing Home
Represented By: Russell W. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?