Dodd et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Plaintiff: Charles Dodd and Lacy Dodd
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated and Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2019cv00208
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/4/19. (cs)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by David Shelton on behalf of Charles Dodd, Lacy Dodd of Filing Affirmation in Response to Show Cause Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Shelton, David)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Shelton, David)
October 22, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Shelton on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Shelton, David)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 11/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/21/19. (cs)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated; granting #11 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorney Richard B. North, Jr terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/26/19. (cs)
September 26, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Richard North, Jr., MOTION to Substitute Attorney Elizabeth Ross Hadley by Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Hadley, Elizabeth)
September 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Carter Thompson, Jr on behalf of Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated (Thompson, J.)
September 20, 2019 Filing 9 CORPORATE STATEMENT OF DEFENDANTS. (Hadley, Elizabeth)
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Elizabeth Ross Hadley on behalf of All Defendants (Hadley, Elizabeth)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of Failure by Counsel to be Admitted to Practice Re: Richard B. North, Jr, Andres F Alonso, David B Krangle (jtm)
September 11, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B. Biggers and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jtm)
September 11, 2019 Filing 6 MDL TRANSFER ORDER (Attachments: #1 Bard Docket Sheet (Main MDL Case), #2 Notice of Filing Submission, #3 Case Management Orders, #4 Discovery Orders, #5 Discovery and Privilege Orders, #6 Daubert Orders, #7 Motions in Limine Orders, #8 Deposition Designation Orders, #9 Miscellaneous Orders, #10 Master and Short-Form Pleadings) (jtm)
September 11, 2019 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arizona; Case Number 2:18-cv-00350. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
September 10, 2019 Remark: Transferring Case to the Northern District of Mississippi via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING AMENDED SCHEDULES FOR CASES TO BE TRANSFERRED OR REMANDED re: #3 . Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/26/19. (SLQ) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUGGESTION OF REMAND AND TRANSFER ORDER. See Order for Details. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 8/19/19. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.]
February 1, 2018 Filing 2 This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell, with member case number: CV-18-00350-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.]
February 1, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15120336 filed by Lacy Dodd, Charles Dodd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAS) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/11/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dodd et al v. C R Bard Incorporated et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Dodd
Represented By: David B Krangle
Represented By: Andres F Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lacy Dodd
Represented By: David B Krangle
Represented By: Andres F Alonso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C R Bard Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated
Represented By: Richard B. North, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?