Evans v. Saul
Plaintiff: Renee White Evans
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00216
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Andrew M. Saul served on 9/30/2019 (tab)
September 27, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Andrew M. Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Forwarded to USM for service. (jwr)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/26/19. (cs)
September 23, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Renee White Evans. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis) (jwr)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Renee White Evans. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evans v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee White Evans
Represented By: Sarah Lynn Dickey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?