Colyer v. Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Zack C. Colyer
Defendant: Vanetta A. Johnson, JNJ Express, Inc., John Does 1-3 and JNJ Logistics, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00218
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 18 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Record from State Court) (Wyatt, Carl)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/1/19. (irw)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)
November 1, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process: Vanetta A. Johnson (tab)
October 31, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 9/28/2020 09:30 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 West before Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers. (kbt)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 4/27/2020. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 12/6/2019. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 1/27/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 2/27/2020. Motions due by 5/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/29/19. (irw)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 10/29/2019. (irw)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Jennifer Collins on behalf of Zack Colyer to Defendants. (Collins, Jennifer)
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures of Defendants, JNJ Express, Inc. and JNJ Logistics, LLC by Carl K. Wyatt on behalf of JNJ Express, Inc., JNJ Logistics, LLC to Plaintiff. (Wyatt, Carl)
October 8, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION disregard filing, no notice of filing required re #8 Notice of Service (tab)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to Vanetta A. Johnson. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Vanetta A. Johnson by Jennifer Collins on behalf of Zack Colyer. (Collins, Jennifer)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2019 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/1/19. (irw)
September 27, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by JNJ Express, Inc., JNJ Logistics, LLC. (Wyatt, Carl)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit Docket Report, #3 Exhibit Notice of Service, #4 Exhibit Summons JNJ Express, Inc., #5 Exhibit Summons JNJ Logistics, LLC, #6 Exhibit Summons Vanetta Johnson) (Wyatt, Carl)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Carl K. Wyatt on behalf of JNJ Express, Inc., JNJ Logistics, LLC (Wyatt, Carl)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Wyatt, Carl)
September 24, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)
September 24, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Zack C. Colyer. (jwr)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by JNJ Express, Inc. from Circuit Court of Desoto County, case number CI2019-282. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1722346) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by JNJ Express, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colyer v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanetta A. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JNJ Express, Inc.
Represented By: Carl K. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JNJ Logistics, LLC
Represented By: Carl K. Wyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zack C. Colyer
Represented By: Jennifer Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?