Havens v. Tallahatchie County Sheriff's Department et al
Plaintiff: Roger Havens
Defendant: William L. Brewer, Benji McKinney, Timothy Cole, Melinda Morgan, Steve Simmons, Tallahatchie County Sheriff's Department and Pete Griffen
Case Number: 3:2019cv00225
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #8 Order, Set Hearings, Set/Clear Flags. (jla)
November 21, 2019 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #7 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. (jla)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER; Spears Hearing set for 1/14/2020 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 2 before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/8/19. (jla)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis without Assessing Payment of Inmate Filing Fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/8/19. (jla)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Roger Havens. Case reassigned to Magistrate Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (jla)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 Order Setting PSP Deadline and NOTICE of Intent to Continue Lawsuit. (jla)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting PSP Deadline: PSP Forms due by 11/18/2019.. Signed by Clerk on 10/17/19. (jla)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roger Havens. (jla)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT challenging conditions of confinement,, filed by Roger Havens. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Havens v. Tallahatchie County Sheriff's Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William L. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benji McKinney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melinda Morgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Simmons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tallahatchie County Sheriff's Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pete Griffen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Havens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?