Greer v. Elliott et al
Plaintiff: Julia Greer
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo International PLC, Purdue Pharma L.P., Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A., Marshall Hollis, Endo Health Solutions Inc., John Does 1-10, Hollis Discount Pharmacy, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc. and Charles Elliott, M.D.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00260
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Remark: Case transferred from Mississippi Northern has been opened in Northern District of Ohio as case 1:19-op-46117, filed 12/09/2019. (jtm)
December 5, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFIED CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Case Transferred to Northern District of Ohio. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. CASE CLOSED. (jtm)
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint - State Court by Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.; filed in State Court. (jla)
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED ANSWER to #2 Complaint - State Court by Charles Elliott, MD; filed in State Court. (jla)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.; filed in State Court. (jla)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Charles Elliott, MD; filed in State Court. (jla)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certification of State Court Record, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Docket, #3 Exhibit C - Complaint, #4 Exhibit D - Notice of Appearance of David Upchurch, Leo Carmody and John McIntosh, #5 Exhibit E - Answer and Defenses of Charles Elliott, #6 Exhibit F - Answer and Defenses of Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, #7 Exhibit G - Motion to Dismiss by Charles Elliott, #8 Exhibit H - Defendants Undisputed Facts in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #9 Exhibit I - Summons to Purdue Pharma, Inc., #10 Exhibit J - Summons to Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., #11 Exhibit K - Summons to Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., #12 Exhibit L - Summons to Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., #13 Exhibit M - Summons to EndoHealth Solution, Inc., #14 Exhibit N - Summons to Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., #15 Exhibit O - Summons to Purdue Pharma, L.P., #16 Exhibit P - Plaintiff's Response to Motion to Dismiss, #17 Exhibit Q - Summons toPrimary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A., #18 Exhibit R - Summons to Charles Elliott, M.D., #19 Exhibit S - Summons to Marshall Hollis., #20 Exhibit T - Summons to Hollis Discount Pharmacy, Inc., #21 Exhibit U - Amended Answer and Defenses of Charles Elliott, #22 Exhibit V - Amended Answer and Defenses of Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, #23 Exhibit W - Order of Recusal, #24 Exhibit X - Order Appointing Special Judge, #25 Exhibit Y - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal) (Gregory, Samuel)
November 26, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by R. David Kaufman on behalf of Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. of Suggestion of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings and Notice of Preliminary Injunction Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Purdue's Bankruptcy Petition, #2 Exhibit B - 2nd Amended Order Granting Preliminary Injunction) (Kaufman, R.)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/25/19. (bnd)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leo Joseph Carmody, Jr on behalf of Charles Elliott, MD, Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A. (Carmody, Leo)
November 23, 2019 Filing 6 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Maron, David)
November 22, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #3 Corporate Statement; Please refile to include electronic signature of Samuel Gregory (jla)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court, #1 Notice of Removal,,, Unopposed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.. (Maron, David)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/19/19. (rtc)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Gregory, Samuel)
November 18, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Julia Greer. (jla)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc. from Tippah County Circuit Court, case number CV2019-106. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1740558) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greer v. Elliott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Represented By: David Friederich Maron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: David Friederich Maron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Deucalion Gregory
Represented By: David Friederich Maron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo International PLC
Represented By: Samuel Deucalion Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Represented By: R. David Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primary Care Clinic of Ripley, P.A.
Represented By: Leo Joseph Carmody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall Hollis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Deucalion Gregory
Represented By: David Friederich Maron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollis Discount Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
Represented By: R. David Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Represented By: R. David Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Elliott, M.D.
Represented By: Leo Joseph Carmody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Greer
Represented By: Jefferson Vaughan Hester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?