Buckner v. West Tallahatchie School District et al
Plaintiff: Mark S. Buckner, Sr.
Defendant: West Tallahatchie School District, Devora Berden, Gloria Carter, Dr. Tracey Mims, Mrs. Cora Hooper, Mrs. Lucinda Berryhill, Marvin George, Madalyn Johnson and Christopher Furdge
Case Number: 3:2019cv00264
Filed: November 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Filing 16 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Devora Berden, Lucinda Berryhill, Gloria Carter, Christopher Furdge, Marvin George, Cora Hooper, Madalyn Johnson, Tracey Mims, West Tallahatchie School District, Jury Demand, filed by Mark S. Buckner, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Amended Affidavit of Facts in Support of Amended Civil Complaint) (tab)
January 14, 2020 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Tracy Mims, Summons, re #1 Amended Complaint,. (tab)
January 14, 2020 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT re #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis, #7 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct. (jla)
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed Marvin George served on 12/27/2019. (jwr)
January 8, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Cora Hooper served on 1/6/2020. (jwr)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Lucinda Berryhill served on 1/6/2020. (jwr)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Tracey Mims served on 12/24/2019. (jwr)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Gloria Carter. (jwr)
January 8, 2020 Filing 8 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed 1/6/2020 by Devora Berden, Christopher Furdge, Madalyn Johnson, West Tallahatchie School District. (jwr)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/30/19. (jcm)
December 26, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend Complaint and to Add Present and Extra Exhibits to the Records by Mark S. Buckner, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (jwr)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants; forwarded to US Marshal for service. (jla) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/4/2019) (jla).
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders on 12/3/19. (jcm)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Debra M Brown and Magistrate Judge David Sanders. (tab)
November 26, 2019 Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge David A. Sanders. Magistrate Judge Roy Percy no longer assigned to the case. (tab)
November 26, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Mark S. Buckner, Sr. (tab)
November 26, 2019 Filing 1 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Devora Berden, Lucinda Berryhill, Gloria Carter, Christopher Furdge, Marvin George, Cora Hooper, Madalyn Johnson, Tracey Mims, West Tallahatchie School District, Jury Demand, filed by Mark S. Buckner, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Facts in Support of Civil Complaint, #2 Exhibit A Charge of Discrimination, #3 Exhibit B Right to Sue Letter) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckner v. West Tallahatchie School District et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Tallahatchie School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Devora Berden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gloria Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Tracey Mims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Cora Hooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Lucinda Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madalyn Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Furdge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark S. Buckner, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?