City of Holly Springs v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Holly Springs
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P., Liddy Pharmacy, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Mallinckrodt PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Allergan PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Cassandra Hawkins, M.D., Actavis LLC, Abbvie Inc., Byhalia Family Health Center, CVS Health, Cardinal Health, Inc., Robinson Pharmacy, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Tyson Pharmacy, Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Mckesson Corp., Janssen Pharamaceuticals, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Purdue Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00287
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Neal B Biggers
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting, but not to the extent requested, #43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #34 MOTION to Dismiss (until 2/18/2020). Responses due by 2/18/2020. Replies due by 2/25/2020. No further written order will issue by this Court. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 2/10/2020. (no document attached) (ray)
February 6, 2020 Filing 45 Response in Opposition to #36 Walgreen's Supplemental Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - County of Arlington Memo Opinioin & Order, #2 Exhibit B - Supreme Court Oral ARgument Transcipt Exhibits, #3 Exhibit C - Johson County Order, #4 Exhibit D - City of Boston Order on Motion Remand and Motion Stay, #5 Exhibit E - City of Worcester Order & Memo, #6 Exhibit F - County of Dallas Order, #7 Exhibit G - City of VAn Zerndt Memo Opinion & Order) (Moore, Carlos) Modified on 2/14/2020 (edc).
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/4/20. (bnd)
February 3, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant Byhalia Family Health Center Motion to Dismiss Unopposed by City of Holly Springs. (Moore, Carlos)
February 3, 2020 Filing 42 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #41 MOTION to Dismiss Tyson Pharmacy as a Party Defendant. (Smith, Kent)
February 3, 2020 Filing 41 MOTION to Dismiss by Tyson Pharmacy. (Smith, Kent)
January 31, 2020 Filing 40 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond by Mckesson Corp.. (Gibbs, Robert)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tyson Pharmacy answer due 2/27/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/31/20. (bnd)
January 28, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and Affirmative Defenses by Tyson Pharmacy. (Smith, Kent)
January 28, 2020 Filing 37 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kent Elliot Smith on behalf of Tyson Pharmacy (Smith, Kent)
January 23, 2020 Filing 36 NOTICE by Leo Joseph Carmody, Jr on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, Supplemental Notice of Removal (Carmody, Leo)
January 21, 2020 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #34 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit Summons issued for Byhalia Family Health Center, #3 Exhibit Affidvit of Service of Byhalia Family Health Center, #4 Exhibit Miss. A. G. Opinion 2003-0325, 2003 WL 21962295) (Farese, John)
January 21, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss by Byhalia Family Health Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief, #2 Exhibit Summons issued for Byhalia Family Health Center, #3 Exhibit Affidvit of Service of Byhalia Family Health Center, #4 Exhibit Miss. A. G. Opinion 2003-0325, 2003 WL 21962295) (Farese, John)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Byhalia Family Health Center answer due 1/25/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/17/20. (bnd)
January 17, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Louis, Thomas)
January 17, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dorissa S. Smith on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Smith, Dorissa)
January 17, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Mansfield, Kenna)
January 15, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Byhalia Family Health Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreed Order) (Farese, John) Modified on 1/16/2020 (jla).
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 AMENDED ORDER re #27 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by CVS Health. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/14/20. (bnd)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/14/20. (bnd)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 AGREED ORDER finding as moot #15 Motion to Consolidate Cases, GRANTING EXTENSION TO RESPOND TO MOTION TO REMAND AND STAYING BRIEFING ON PENDING MOTION TO REMAND, GRANTING PERMISSION TO FILE SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND AMENDED MOTION TO REMAND. DEFENDANTS MUST FILE THE SUPPLEMENTAL NOTICE OF REMOVAL NO LATER THAN JANUARY 23, 2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/13/20. (bnd) Modified on 1/14/2020 (jla).
January 13, 2020 Case Reassigned to District Judge Sharion Aycock. Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers no longer assigned to the case. (jtm)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF RECUSAL... Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 1/13/2020. (llw)
January 10, 2020 Filing 24 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer for CVS Health Corporation, Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., and Walmart Inc. by CVS Health. (Mayo, J.) Modified on 1/13/2020 (jla).
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/10/20. (bnd)
January 9, 2020 Filing 22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Responsive Pleading by Mckesson Corp.. (Gibbs, Robert) Modified on 1/10/2020 (jla).
January 8, 2020 Filing 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/8/2020. (rtc)
January 7, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tujuana S. McGee on behalf of Mckesson Corp. (McGee, Tujuana)
January 7, 2020 NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2020 re #19 Order Staying Case. NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (rtc)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING RULING ON MOTION TO REMAND. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/7/20. (bnd)
January 7, 2020 Filing 18 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Cole, Edderek)
January 7, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Stephen Lee Thomas on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. of Conditional Transfer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A. Conditional Transfer Order) (Thomas, Stephen)
January 6, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #15 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Carmody, Leo)
January 6, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.. (Carmody, Leo)
January 6, 2020 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Allergan PLC, Mallinckrodt PLC. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
January 2, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE STATEMENT Disclosure. (Thomas, Stephen)
January 2, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Simon T. Bailey on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Bailey, Simon)
December 31, 2019 Filing 11 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Clerk Certificate, #2 Circuit Court Docket Sheet, #3 Complaint, #4 Civil Cover Sheet with Attachments, #5 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Purdue Defendants, #6 Summons issued to each Defendantv, #7 Agreed Order Enlarging Time to Respond (CVS, Walgreens, Walmart), #8 Agreed Order Enlarging Time to Respond (other parties)) (Gregory, Samuel)
December 31, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leo Joseph Carmody, Jr on behalf of Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. (Carmody, Leo)
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Holly Springs. (Moore, Carlos)
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand to State Court by City of Holly Springs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order regarding Remands in Fed MDL, #2 Exhibit 2 - Fed MDL CMO One, #3 Exhibit 3 - Arlington - Order granting Motion to Remand (ECF 63)_17449625, #4 Exhibit 4 - County of Dallas, #5 Exhibit 5 - County of Van Zandt, #6 Exhibit 6 - Hyhalia Family Health Center Affidavit of Service, #7 Exhibit 7 - CVS Health Affidavit of Service, #8 Exhibit 8 - Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc. Affidavit of Service, #9 Exhibit 9 - Wal-Mart Stores Inc. Affidavit of Service) (Moore, Carlos)
December 30, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Thompson, J.)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer AmerisourceBergen Corporation answer due 1/17/2020; Mckesson Corp. answer due 1/17/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/26/19. (bnd)
December 24, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Responsive Pleading by Mckesson Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email Exchange) (Gibbs, Robert)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Cal Mayo, Jr on behalf of CVS Health (Mayo, J.)
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 1/27/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/20/19. (rtc)
December 19, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)
December 19, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by City of Holly Springs. (jwr)
December 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. from Circuit Court of Marshall County, case number CV2019-201. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1752302) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Dismissal, #2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Holly Springs v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Holly Springs
Represented By: Carlos Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liddy Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Represented By: Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr.
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Deucalion Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Hawkins, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byhalia Family Health Center
Represented By: John Booth Farese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: Leo Joseph Carmody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Samuel Deucalion Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Chad R. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Pharmacy
Represented By: Kent Elliot Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mckesson Corp.
Represented By: Tujuana S. McGee
Represented By: Robert L. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharamaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Hutchinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?