City of Holly Springs v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Plaintiff: City of Holly Springs
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Liddy Pharmacy, McKesson Corporation, Mallinckrodt PLC, The Purdue Frederick Company, Watson Laboratories Inc., Allergan PLC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Actavis LLC, Abbvie Inc., Byhalia Family Health Center, CVS Health, Allergan Finance LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Cassandra Hawkins, M.D., Cardinal Health Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Tyson Pharmacy, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc., AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Robinson Pharmacy and Purdue Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00288
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Neal B Biggers
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AGREED ORDER OF DISMISSAL. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 1/13/2020. (jwr)
January 13, 2020 Case Reassigned to District Judge Sharion Aycock. Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers no longer assigned to the case. (jtm)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF RECUSAL... Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 1/13/2020. (llw)
January 9, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and/or Responsive Pleading by McKesson Corporation. (Gibbs, Robert)
January 8, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Simon T. Bailey on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc. (Bailey, Simon)
January 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephen Lee Thomas on behalf of Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc. (Thomas, Stephen)
January 8, 2020 NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2020 re #8 Order Staying Case. NO DOCUMENT ATTACHED. (rtc)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Telephonic Status Conference held on 1/8/2020. (rtc)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING RULING ON MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/8/20. (bnd)
January 7, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tujuana S. McGee on behalf of McKesson Corporation (McGee, Tujuana)
January 6, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc.. (Carmody, Leo)
January 6, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc.. (Carmody, Leo)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/30/19. (rtc)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Cal Mayo, Jr on behalf of CVS Health (Mayo, J.)
December 20, 2019 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Neal B Biggers and Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (tab)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Abbvie Inc., Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance LLC, Allergan PLC, AmerisourceBergen Corporation, Byhalia Family Health Center, CVS Health, Cardinal Health Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc., Cassandra Hawkins, MD, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Knoll Pharmaceutical Company, Liddy Pharmacy, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Robinson Pharmacy, The Purdue Frederick Company, Tyson Pharmacy, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc., Watson Laboratories Inc., filed by City of Holly Springs. (tab)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc. from Circuit Court of Marshall County, Mississippi, case number CV2019-201. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1752892) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Process, #2 Exhibit B State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit C State Court Record, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (tab)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Holly Springs v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liddy Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Represented By: Tujuana S. McGee
Represented By: Robert L. Gibbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Purdue Frederick Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc.
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byhalia Family Health Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassandra Hawkins, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyson Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boot Alliance, Inc.
Represented By: John Mark McIntosh
Represented By: David Walker Upchurch
Represented By: Leo Joseph Carmody, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Knoll Pharmaceutical Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robinson Pharmacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Holly Springs
Represented By: Carlos Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?