Buff City Soap LLC et al v. Bynum et al
Plaintiff: Buff City Soap LLC and Buff City Soap Holdings LLC
Defendant: Buff City New Albany, LLC, Magen Bynum, Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of Tupelo, LLC, Magnolia Soap & Bath Holding Co., LLC, Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of Oxford, LLC and Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of New Albany, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00055
Filed: February 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1121
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Buff City New Albany, LLC, Magen Bynum, Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of New Albany, LLC, Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of Oxford, LLC, Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of Tupelo, LLC, Magnolia Soap & Bath Holding Co., LLC. (Halbert, Mark)
March 27, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Steven Muckleroy on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Muckleroy, Matthew)
March 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam S. Baldridge on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Baldridge, Adam)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Matthew Steven Muckleroy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/26/20. (bnd)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Adam S. Baldridge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/26/20. (bnd)
March 25, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Matthew Steven Muckleroy ; Attorney Matthew Steven Muckleroy,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1787322) by Buff City Soap Holdings LLC, Buff City Soap LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Previous PHV Admissions) (Busey, Zachary)
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Adam S. Baldridge ; Attorney Adam S. Baldridge,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1787310) by Buff City Soap Holdings LLC, Buff City Soap LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cert. of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Previous PHV Admissions) (Busey, Zachary)
March 25, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Magen Bynum and Buff City New Albany, LLC (jla)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 5/21/2020 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/17/2020. (rtc)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of New Albany, LLC answer due 4/15/2020; Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of Oxford, LLC answer due 4/15/2020; Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of Tupelo, LLC answer due 4/15/2020; Magnolia Soap & Bath Holding Co., LLC answer due 4/15/2020.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/16/20. (bnd)
March 12, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of New Albany, LLC, Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of Oxford, LLC, Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of Tupelo, LLC, Magnolia Soap & Bath Holding Co., LLC. (Halbert, Mark)
February 24, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zachary B. Busey on behalf of Buff City Soap Holdings LLC, Buff City Soap LLC Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of New Albany, LLC served on 2/20/2020. (Busey, Zachary)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zachary B. Busey on behalf of Buff City Soap Holdings LLC, Buff City Soap LLC Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of Tupelo, LLC served on 2/20/2020. (Busey, Zachary)
February 24, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zachary B. Busey on behalf of Buff City Soap Holdings LLC, Buff City Soap LLC Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of Oxford, LLC served on 2/20/2020. (Busey, Zachary)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Zachary B. Busey on behalf of Buff City Soap Holdings LLC, Buff City Soap LLC Magnolia Soap & Bath Holding Co., LLC served on 2/20/2020. (Busey, Zachary)
February 19, 2020 Filing 3 Remark; Form AO-120 - forwarded to Director of the US Patent and Trademark Office (jla)
February 19, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
February 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of New Albany, LLC, Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of Oxford, LLC, Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of Tupelo, LLC, Magnolia Soap & Bath Holding Co., LLC.; emailed to Attorney for service (jla)
February 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1773746, filed by Buff City Soap Holdings LLC, Buff City Soap LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - New Albany OA, #2 Exhibit B - Collective Trademark Registrations, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buff City Soap LLC et al v. Bynum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Buff City New Albany, LLC
Represented By: Mark Nolan Halbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magen Bynum
Represented By: Mark Nolan Halbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of Tupelo, LLC
Represented By: Mark Nolan Halbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnolia Soap & Bath Holding Co., LLC
Represented By: Mark Nolan Halbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of Oxford, LLC
Represented By: Mark Nolan Halbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Magnolia Soap & Bath Co. of New Albany, LLC
Represented By: Mark Nolan Halbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buff City Soap LLC
Represented By: Zachary B. Busey
Represented By: Matthew Steven Muckleroy
Represented By: Adam S. Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buff City Soap Holdings LLC
Represented By: Zachary B. Busey
Represented By: Matthew Steven Muckleroy
Represented By: Adam S. Baldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?