Driver v. Davis et al
Plaintiff: Dennis E. Driver
Defendant: Brian L. Davis, Davis Law Firm, PLLC and Ervin R. Bennett
Case Number: 3:2020cv00123
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER denying #13 Motion for Recusal. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 6/22/20. (ab)
June 19, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dennis E. Driver. (jla)
June 19, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Recusal by Dennis E. Driver. (jla)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER STAYING CASE pending ruling on #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 6/11/20. (ab)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed 5/1/2020, all defendants (tab)
June 10, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed Ervin R. Bennett served on 5/1/2020; Brian L. Davis served on 5/1/2020; Davis Law Firm, PLLC served on 5/1/2020. (jtm)
June 10, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Sanctions by Dennis E. Driver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits A & B) (jtm)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike "Notice of Appearance" from the Record by Dennis E. Driver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jtm)
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ervin R. Bennett, Brian L. Davis, Davis Law Firm, PLLC. (Davis, Brian)
May 21, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM : Incorrect document filed; please disregard per attorney. Correct document filed as #6 . (jwr)
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ervin R. Bennett, Brian L. Davis, Davis Law Firm, PLLC. (Davis, Brian)
May 20, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ervin R. Bennett, Brian L. Davis, Davis Law Firm, PLLC. (Davis, Brian)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Permanent Injunction & Demand for Emergency Hearing by Dennis E. Driver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (jtm)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants; returned to plaintiff for service via USPS. (jla)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number MSN300025856, filed by Dennis E. Driver. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Driver v. Davis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian L. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davis Law Firm, PLLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ervin R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis E. Driver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?