Presley et al v. Bradford et al
Plaintiff: Lauri Presley and Rick Presley
Defendant: John Does 1-3, Quinton Bradford and EAN Holdings, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00189
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 10 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Entry of Appearance) (Green, Donna)
August 4, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #9 State Court Record - Removal; Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket entry #1 with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. (jla)
August 3, 2020 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Green, Donna)
August 3, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Quinton Bradford (jla)
July 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 10/13/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case management conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/8/20. (cs)
July 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF SERVICE of EAN's Response to Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Admission by Donna Powe Green on behalf of EAN Holdings, LLC to Plaintiffs. (Green, Donna)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 8/6/2020 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/26/2020. (rtc)
June 26, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Green, Donna)
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Green, Donna)
June 25, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Quinton Bradford, EAN Holdings, LLC, John Does 1-3, filed by Lauri Presley, Rick Presley. (jla)
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by EAN Holdings, LLC from Tippah County Circuit Court, case number CV2020-029JAG. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1821902) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by EAN Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Affidavit, #3 Certification, #4 Notice of Adverse Parties and State Court Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Presley et al v. Bradford et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quinton Bradford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EAN Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Donna Powe Green
Represented By: Michael R. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauri Presley
Represented By: William D. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Presley
Represented By: William D. Montgomery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?