Rash v. Lafayette County, Mississippi
Plaintiff: John Rash
Defendant: Lafayette County, Mississippi
Case Number: 3:2020cv00224
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/18/2020. (rtc)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of Trial: Non-Jury Trial set for 6/7/2021 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 West before Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers. (kbt)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/26/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 1/15/2021. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 10/15/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 11/2/2020. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 12/2/2020. Motions due by 2/2/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/15/2020. (rtc)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 9/15/2020. (rtc)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Joshua Fiyenn Tom on behalf of John Rash to Lafayette County, MS. (Tom, Joshua)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by David D. O'Donnell on behalf of Lafayette County, Mississippi to plaintiff. (O'Donnell, David)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER to #29 Amended Complaint, by Lafayette County, Mississippi. (O'Donnell, David)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures by Joshua Fiyenn Tom on behalf of John Rash to Lafayette County, MS. (Tom, Joshua)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 NOTICE by Joshua Fiyenn Tom on behalf of John Rash of Service of Requests for Production of Documents (Tom, Joshua)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lafayette County, Mississippi,, filed by John Rash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 2015 Facility Use Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 2019 Facility Use Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 June 2020 Facility Use Policy, #4 Exhibit 4 July 2020 Facility Use Policy) (Tom, Joshua)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lafayette County, Mississippi. (O'Donnell, David)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #17 Memorandum in Support; All related filings to motion should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has madethe correction. (jla)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 9/15/2020 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/12/2020. (rtc)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case management conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/12/2020. (rtc)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OPINION re #25 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 8/6/2020. (llw)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 8/6/2020. (llw)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Rash. (Tom, Joshua)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 EXHIBITS - TRIAL/HEARING. Motion Hearing - Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Hearing held 8/5/2020 (kbt)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Exhibit List. Motion Hearing - Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Hearing held 8/5/2020. (kbt)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Witness List - Motion Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction held on 8/5/2020. (kbt)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers: Motion Hearing held on 8/5/2020 re #3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by John Rash --Exhibits Admitted. (Court Reporter Rita Davis.) (kbt)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Isaac Rethy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/5/20. (bnd)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Jonathan Youngwood. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/5/20. (bnd)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #16 Response in Opposition to Motion re #3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lafayette County, Mississippi. (O'Donnell, David) Modified on 8/18/2020 (jla).
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Lafayette County, Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -County Facility Policy 2015, #2 Exhibit B-County Facility Policy 2019, #3 Exhibit C- Board June 2020 minutes, #4 Exhibit D - July 2020 Board minutes, #5 Exhibit E- YAC Announcement, #6 Exhibit F - Rash July email, #7 Exhibit G- Oxford Permit, #8 Exhibit H- County Permit Denial with App) (O'Donnell, David)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 EXHIBIT re #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Isaac Rethy,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1835538) - Updated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Tom, Joshua)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EXHIBIT re #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jonathan Youngwood,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1835534) - Updated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Tom, Joshua)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by C. Jackson Williams on behalf of John Rash (Williams, C.)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Isaac Rethy, #9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jonathan Youngwood: Attorney to refile each motion with the signature of resident attorney as required by L.U.Civ.R 83.1(d)(4)(K). Please use the civil event "Exhibits to Other Document" and link to the original motion. All filings should also be filed using the login credentials of signing attorney. (jwr)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE by Joshua Fiyenn Tom on behalf of John Rash re #3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Updated Notice of Hearing (Tom, Joshua)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE by Joshua Fiyenn Tom on behalf of John Rash re #3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Notice of Hearing (Tom, Joshua)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Isaac Rethy,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1835538) by John Rash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Thames, Landon)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jonathan Youngwood,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1835534) by John Rash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Thames, Landon)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction : Motion Hearing set for 8/5/2020 01:30 PM in Oxford Courtroom 3 West before Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers. (kbt)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Landon P. Thames on behalf of John Rash (Thames, Landon)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Set Deadlines/Hearings: Lafayette County, Mississippi answer due 8/20/2020. (jla)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Lafayette County, Mississippi 7/31/2020 (Tom, Joshua)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joshua Fiyenn Tom on behalf of John Rash (Tom, Joshua)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (Tom, Joshua)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by John Rash. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2015 Facility Use Policy, #2 Exhibit 2019 Facility Use Policy, #3 Exhibit 2020 Facility Use Policy, #4 Exhibit John Rash Declaration, #5 Exhibit 1 to Rash Decl - Projection at Fringe 2019, #6 Exhibit 2 to Rash Decl - Photo of confederate rally, #7 Exhibit 3 to Rash Decl - Rash July 7 email, #8 Exhibit 4 to Rash Decl - Carwyle July 23 email, #9 Exhibit 5 to Rash Decl - Permit Denial, #10 Exhibit 6 to Rash Decl - Carwyle July 27 email, #11 Exhibit 7 to Rash Decl - Oxford Film Fest) (Tom, Joshua)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lafayette County, Mississippi. Emailed to attorney for service. (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (jwr)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1834910, filed by John Rash. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rash v. Lafayette County, Mississippi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Rash
Represented By: Landon P. Thames
Represented By: Joshua Fiyenn Tom
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Represented By: C. Jackson Williams
Represented By: Isaac M. Rethy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lafayette County, Mississippi
Represented By: David D. O'Donnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?