Danco LLC et al v. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Indy Eatery LLC doing business as News Cafe and Danco LLC doing business as Newks Express Cafe
Defendant: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Counter Defendant: Danco LLC and Indy Eatery LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00235
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/2/2022 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 10/8/2021. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 12/15/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 6/7/2021. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 7/6/2021. Motions due by 11/8/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 10/13/2020. (irw)
October 13, 2020 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 10/6/2020. (irw)
September 24, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint - State Court,, Counterclaim, by Danco LLC, Indy Eatery LLC. (Margolis, Alicia)
September 23, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey Greeves on behalf of Danco LLC, Indy Eatery LLC (Greeves, Geoffrey)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Geoffrey J. Greeves. Attorney Greeves shall register electronically by accessing the Attorney Registration site at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf within five (5) business days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/22/20. (bfg)
September 21, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Geoffrey J. Greeves,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1853654) by Danco LLC, Indy Eatery LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing - DC, #2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing-Virginia) (Margolis, Alicia)
September 21, 2020 Filing 12 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons Served, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons Issued) (Gwin, Michael)
September 21, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #1 Notice of Removal; Attorney to file State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket Entry #1 (jla)
September 9, 2020 NOTICE of Conference: #11 Case Management Conference RESET for 10/6/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (irw)
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 10/2/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/4/2020. (irw)
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to State Court Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 Executive Order IN, #3 Exhibit 3 Executive Order KY, #4 Exhibit 4 Executive Order TN, #5 Exhibit 5 Executive Order TN) (Hinshaw, Corey)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Matthew P. Fortin. Attorney Fortin shall register electronically by accessing the Attorney Registration site at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf within five (5) business days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/27/20. (bfg)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Lindsey D. Dean. Attorney Dean shall register electronically by accessing the Attorney Registration site at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf within five (5) business days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/27/20. (bfg)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice re Attorney Adam H. Fleischer. Attorney Fleischer shall register electronically by accessing the Attorney Registration site at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf within five (5) business days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/27/20. (bfg)
August 26, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Matthew P. Fortin,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1844271) by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Illinois) (Hinshaw, Corey)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Lindsey D. Dean,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1844268) by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing Illinois) (Hinshaw, Corey)
August 26, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Adam H. Fleischer,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number 0537-1844264) by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A Certificate of Good Standing Illinois, #2 Exhibit Ex. B Certificate of Good Standing New York) (Hinshaw, Corey)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant shall have ten (10) additional days within which to file an answer or other responsive pleading. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company answer due 9/3/2020. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/24/20. (bfg)(no document attached)
August 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint - State Court by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Gwin, Michael)
August 17, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)
August 17, 2020 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Danco LLC, Indy Eatery LLC. (jla)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company from Union County Circuit Court, case number CV2020-132. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1840577) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint received by State Auto Property, #2 Exhibit B - Certified Circuit Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danco LLC et al v. State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indy Eatery LLC doing business as News Cafe
Represented By: Alicia Kate Margolis
Represented By: John Alexander Purvis
Represented By: Geoffrey Greeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danco LLC doing business as Newks Express Cafe
Represented By: Alicia Kate Margolis
Represented By: John Alexander Purvis
Represented By: Geoffrey Greeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Auto Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Corey D. Hinshaw
Represented By: William F. Ray
Represented By: Michael O'Mara Gwin
Represented By: Lindsey D. Dean
Represented By: Adam Hoyt Fleischer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Danco LLC
Represented By: Alicia Kate Margolis
Represented By: John Alexander Purvis
Represented By: Geoffrey Greeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Indy Eatery LLC
Represented By: Alicia Kate Margolis
Represented By: John Alexander Purvis
Represented By: Geoffrey Greeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?