Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company v. Wilkerson et al
Plaintiff: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Frank J. Wilkerson, Jr., Cynthia Wilkerson, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services/The United States of America, Mississippi Division of Medicaid/The State of Mississippi, Peggy J. Wilkerson and Tina Renee Kreunen
Case Number: 3:2020cv00252
Filed: August 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 AMENDED AGREED ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT resolving Complaint for Interpleader and Dismissing Action. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 1/28/2021. (jtm)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 AGREED ORDER AND FINAL JUDGMENT resolving Complaint for Interpleader and Dismissing Action. CASE CLOSED. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 1/28/21. (jla)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY NOTICE Cancelling Settlement Conference set for 1/27/2021. No document attached. (rtc)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic settlement conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/18/2020. (no document attached) (rtc)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Mississippi Division of Medicaid/The State of Mississippi answer due 1/19/2021. (jla)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #38 Motion to Substitute Party. Tina Renee Kreunen added. Cynthia Wilkerson terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/20/2020. (jtm)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Substitute Party - Unopposed by Cynthia Wilkerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Copy of Chancery Order, #2 Exhibit Consent to Substitution, #3 Exhibit Good Faith Certificate) (Hisaw, Jerry)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/20/20. (bnd)
November 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for Extension of Time Unopposed by Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services/The United States of America. (Benedict, Joseph)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Supplemental Pre-Discovery Initial Disclosures by Samuel P. Goff on behalf of Mississippi Division of Medicaid/The State of Mississippi, Mississippi Division of Medicaid/The State of Mississippi to All Counsel of Record. (Goff, Samuel)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/10/2020. (rtc)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/5/20. (bnd)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 NOTICE of Trial: Non-Jury Trial set for 11/15/2021 10:00 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 West before Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers. (kbt)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Protective Order by Mississippi Division of Medicaid/The State of Mississippi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A (Proposed Agreed HIPAA Qualified Protective Order) (Goff, Samuel)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER regarding settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/5/2020. (rtc)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 6/24/2021. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 12/7/2020. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 3/24/2021. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 4/26/2021. Motions due by 7/15/2021. Settlement Conference set for 1/27/2021 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/5/2020. (rtc)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 11/5/2020. (rtc)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pre-Discovery Initial Disclosures by Samuel P. Goff on behalf of Mississippi Division of Medicaid/The State of Mississippi, Mississippi Division of Medicaid/The State of Mississippi to All Counsel of Record. (Goff, Samuel)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Samuel P. Goff on behalf of Mississippi Division of Medicaid/The State of Mississippi (Goff, Samuel)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Jerry Wesley Hisaw on behalf of Cynthia Wilkerson, Frank J. Wilkerson, Jr, Peggy J. Wilkerson to All Counsel of Record. (Hisaw, Jerry)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Owen Patrick Terry on behalf of Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company to Defendants. (Terry, Owen)
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Confidential Settlement Memorandum by Bryan P. Roberts on behalf of Mississippi Division of Medicaid/The State of Mississippi. (Roberts, Bryan) Modified on 10/21/2020 (jla).
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order TEXT ONLY ORDER requiring telephonic case management conference. Counsel should call conference line 888-363-4735 (participant number 4317261) at previously scheduled time. There will be no in-person attendance permitted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 10/16/2020. (rtc)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Confidential Settlement Memoranda by Jerry Wesley Hisaw on behalf of Cynthia Wilkerson, Frank J. Wilkerson, Jr, Peggy J. Wilkerson to United States Magistrate Judge, Roy Percy. (Hisaw, Jerry)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ANSWER to #18 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim by Cynthia Wilkerson, Frank J. Wilkerson, Jr, Peggy J. Wilkerson. (Hisaw, Jerry)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Response to #18 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim In Interpleader. (Terry, Owen)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint for Interpleader, CROSSCLAIM against Cynthia Wilkerson by Mississippi Division of Medicaid/The State of Mississippi. (Roberts, Bryan)
October 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Bryan P. Roberts on behalf of Mississippi Division of Medicaid/The State of Mississippi (Roberts, Bryan)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Owen Patrick Terry on behalf of Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services/The United States of America served on 9/21/2020. (Terry, Owen)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Owen Patrick Terry on behalf of Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services/The United States of America served on 9/22/2020. (Terry, Owen)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Mississippi Division of Medicaid/The State of Mississippi (jla)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 11/5/2020 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/25/2020. (rtc)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Cynthia Wilkerson, Frank J. Wilkerson, Jr, Peggy J. Wilkerson. (Hisaw, Jerry)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jerry Wesley Hisaw on behalf of Cynthia Wilkerson, Frank J. Wilkerson, Jr, Peggy J. Wilkerson (Hisaw, Jerry)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #6 Summons Returned Executed --- re-filed correctly as docket entry #7 (edc)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sam S. Thomas on behalf of Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company Cynthia Wilkerson served on 9/11/2020. (Thomas, Sam)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sam S. Thomas on behalf of Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company Peggy J. Wilkerson served on 9/11/2020. (Thomas, Sam)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sam S. Thomas on behalf of Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company Frank J. Wilkerson, Jr served on 9/10/2020. (Thomas, Sam)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sam S. Thomas on behalf of Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company Mississippi Division of Medicaid/The State of Mississippi served on 9/10/2020. (Thomas, Sam)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sam S. Thomas on behalf of Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services/The United States of America served on 9/10/2020. (Thomas, Sam)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order DEPOSIT of Funds in the amount of $ 50,000.00, Receipt Number MSN300026544. (jwr)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Deposit Funds. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/14/20. (bnd)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (Terry, Owen)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sam S. Thomas on behalf of Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company (Thomas, Sam)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services/The United States of America, Mississippi Division of Medicaid/The State of Mississippi, Cynthia Wilkerson, Frank J. Wilkerson, Jr, Peggy J. Wilkerson. (jla)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 26465, filed by Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company v. Wilkerson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank J. Wilkerson, Jr.
Represented By: Jerry Wesley Hisaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cynthia Wilkerson
Represented By: Jerry Wesley Hisaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services/The United States of America
Represented By: Joseph Luke Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mississippi Division of Medicaid/The State of Mississippi
Represented By: Bryan P. Roberts
Represented By: Samuel P. Goff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peggy J. Wilkerson
Represented By: Jerry Wesley Hisaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Renee Kreunen
Represented By: Jerry Wesley Hisaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mississippi Farm Bureau Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Sam S. Thomas
Represented By: Owen Patrick Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?