Hawk Technology Systems, LLC v. Kirkland's Inc.
Plaintiff: Hawk Technology Systems, LLC
Defendant: Kirkland's Inc. doing business as Kirkland's Stores, Inc.
Intervenor Defendant: Salient Systems Corporation
Case Number: 3:2020cv00276
Filed: October 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER DISMISSING CASE re #29 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. CASE CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 12/17/20. (ab)
December 17, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Frank John Dantone, Jr on behalf of Hawk Technology Systems, LLC (Dantone, Frank)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER finding as moot #25 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 12/17/20. (ab)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS. Responses due by 1/6/2021. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 12/17/20. (ab)
December 17, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #24 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kirkland's Inc., Salient Systems Corporation. (Getz, Joseph)
December 16, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION to Seal Document #24 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. (Dantone, Frank)
December 16, 2020 Filing 24 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Text of Salient Complaint to be filed under seal) (Dantone, Frank)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Responses due by 12/17/2020, Replies due by 12/31/2020. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 12/8/20. (ab)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/7/20. (jla)
December 7, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. (Dantone, Frank)
December 1, 2020 Filing 20 Restricted Document - MEMORANDUM in Support re #9 First MOTION to Intervene. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jla)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 12/1/20. (jla)
December 1, 2020 Filing 18 Restricted Document - MEMORANDUM in Support re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (jla)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by District Judge Michael P. Mills on 12/1/20. (jla)
November 24, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Salient Systems (corrected). (Getz, Joseph)
November 24, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Salient Systems Corporation. (Getz, Joseph)
November 23, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Corrected per Clerk's Notice). (Getz, Joseph)
November 23, 2020 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION to Seal Document (Corrected per Clerk's Notice). (Getz, Joseph)
November 23, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #9 First MOTION to Intervene by Salient (Corrected per Clerk's Notice). (Getz, Joseph)
November 23, 2020 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #10 MOTION to Seal Document , #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #9 First MOTION to Intervene ; Attorney to refile memorandum brief as a separate docket entry from the motion as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2). (jla)
November 20, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Kirkland's Inc., Salient Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss (REDACTED) o) (Getz, Joseph)
November 20, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Seal Document by Salient Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Non-Confidential Memo in Support of Motion to Seal Documents) (Getz, Joseph)
November 20, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION to Intervene by Salient Systems Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandumin Support of Motion to Intervene (REDACTED)o) (Getz, Joseph)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 1/19/2021 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy.Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/20/2020. (rtc)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 CORPORATE STATEMENT of Kirkland's Inc. d/b/a Kirkland's Stores, Inc.. (Getz, Joseph)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 First MOTION to Seal Document by Kirkland's Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Non-Confidential Memorandum in Support of Motion to File Documents under Seal) (Getz, Joseph)
November 20, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph T. Getz on behalf of Kirkland's Inc. (Getz, Joseph)
November 2, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Dantone, Frank)
October 21, 2020 Filing 3 Remark: Form AO120 mailed to the Director of the US Patent and Trademark Office (jwr)
October 20, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kirkland's Inc. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
October 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1865080, filed by Hawk Technology Systems, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit '091 Patent, #2 Exhibit Claim Chart, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
October 20, 2020 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawk Technology Systems, LLC v. Kirkland's Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirkland's Inc. doing business as Kirkland's Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph T. Getz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawk Technology Systems, LLC
Represented By: Frank John Dantone, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Salient Systems Corporation
Represented By: Joseph T. Getz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?