Peerless Insurance Company v. Bay Design, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Peerless Insurance Company
Defendant: XL Insurance America, Inc. and Eric Farmer
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Bay Design, Inc., Bay Industrial Group, Inc. and Bay Automation, Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: C.A. Weber Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv00035
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 18 CORPORATE STATEMENT Disclosure. (Gillon, William)
April 12, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by William H. Gillon, IV on behalf of Bay Automation, Inc., Bay Design, Inc., Bay Industrial Group, Inc. C.A. Weber Agency, Inc. served on 4/12/2021. (Gillon, William)
April 12, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 6/1/2021 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
April 12, 2021 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to C.A. Weber Agency, Inc. (jla)
April 12, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #15 Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process; DISREGARD, Notice is in Error. (jla)
April 9, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to C.A. Weber Agency, Inc. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
April 9, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against C.A. Weber Agency, Inc. by Bay Industrial Group, Inc., Bay Design, Inc., Bay Automation, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit E-mails and relevant portions of the lease) (Gillon, William)
March 24, 2021 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Bay Design, Inc., Bay Industrial Group, Inc., and Bay Automation, Inc. (jla)
March 12, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by XL Insurance America, Inc.. (Hinkle, John)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 5/4/2021 11:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/12/2021. (rtc)
March 12, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregg A. Caraway on behalf of Peerless Insurance Company XL Insurance America, Inc. served on 2/25/2021. (Caraway, Gregg)
March 12, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregg A. Caraway on behalf of Peerless Insurance Company Eric Farmer served on 2/25/2021. (Caraway, Gregg)
March 12, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregg A. Caraway on behalf of Peerless Insurance Company Bay Industrial Group, Inc. served on 3/9/2021. (Caraway, Gregg)
March 12, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregg A. Caraway on behalf of Peerless Insurance Company Bay Design, Inc. served on 3/9/2021. (Caraway, Gregg)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gregg A. Caraway on behalf of Peerless Insurance Company Bay Automation, Inc. served on 3/9/2021. (Caraway, Gregg)
March 12, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, by Eric Farmer. (Merkel, Charles)
February 24, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kevin A. Rogers on behalf of Peerless Insurance Company (Rogers, Kevin)
February 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
February 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1911907, filed by Peerless Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2017-2018 Umbrella Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - CBP Policies Dec Pages for 2010-2011, #3 Exhibit 3 - Email of 9/7/2004, #4 Exhibit 4 - 2/11/10 GL Coverage Application, #5 Exhibit 5 - 2/11/10 Umbrella-Excess Coverage Application, #6 Exhibit 6 - 3/13/10 CBP Dec Pages, #7 Exhibit 7 - Umbrella Policy Dec Pages, #8 Exhibit 8 - Email dated 8/25/11, #9 Exhibit 9 - Email dated 1/3/13, #10 Exhibit 10 - Email dated 5/31/13, #11 Exhibit 11 - Email dated 4/5/18, #12 Exhibit 12 - Certificates of Insurance, #13 Exhibit 13 - Amended Complaint (Underlying Suit), #14 Exhibit 14 - 7/29/20 Denial Letter, #15 Exhibit 15 - 9/9/20 ROR Letter, #16 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
February 24, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Davidson and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peerless Insurance Company v. Bay Design, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Bay Design, Inc.
Represented By: William H. Gillon, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Bay Industrial Group, Inc.
Represented By: William H. Gillon, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Bay Automation, Inc.
Represented By: William H. Gillon, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XL Insurance America, Inc.
Represented By: John L. Hinkle, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Farmer
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peerless Insurance Company
Represented By: Gregg A. Caraway
Represented By: Kevin A. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: C.A. Weber Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?