Pittman et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Patsy H. Pittman and Thomas Latham "Ty" Pittman
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2021cv00042
Filed: March 1, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Initial Disclosures by Wendell L. Hoskins, II on behalf of Patsy H. Pittman, Thomas Latham "Ty" Pittman to Defendant. (Hoskins, Wendell)
April 19, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Core Disclosures by Lawrence John Tucker, Jr on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Tucker, Lawrence)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/20/2021. (irw)
March 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Jointly proposed Pretrial Order due no later than seven (7) days prior to the conference. (irw)
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 5/23/2022 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (rc)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/18/2022 at 10:00 AM in Judge Virden's Chambers before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Discovery due by 10/6/2021. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 5/7/2021. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 7/6/2021. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 8/6/2021. Daubert Motions due by 11/5/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 12/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/30/2021. (irw)
March 30, 2021 Filing 7 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Case Management Conference held on 3/30/2021. (irw)
March 11, 2021 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Assignment, #4 Exhibit Filing letter, #5 Exhibit Notice of Filing Removal with attachments) (Spragins, Hal)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Case Management Conference set for 3/30/2021 at 11:00 AM via Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 3/2/2021. (irw)
March 2, 2021 Filing 4 CORPORATE STATEMENT of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Tucker, Lawrence)
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Tucker, Lawrence)
March 1, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Patsy H. Pittman, Thomas Latham "Ty" Pittman. (jwr)
March 1, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company from Circuit Court of Quitman County, Mississippi, case number 2021-0006. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-191397) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
March 1, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pittman et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Lawrence John Tucker, Jr.
Represented By: Hal S. Spragins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patsy H. Pittman
Represented By: Wendell L. Hoskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Latham "Ty" Pittman
Represented By: Wendell L. Hoskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?