Misemer Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Plaintiff: Misemer Pharmaceuticals, Inc. and Arun Kapoor
Defendant: Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00107
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Responses due by 8/6/2021; pursuant to ORDER #19 . (jla)
July 22, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 9/9/2021 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (yf)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting Extension of Time. Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC answer due 8/6/2021. Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Response re #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction due 8/6/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/22/2021. (yf)
July 19, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC answer due 7/22/2021. (jla)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Response re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction due by 7/22/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/16/2021. (yf)
July 14, 2021 Filing 17 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Unopposed) by Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Mallette, Pope)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/2/2021. (yf)
July 1, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #15 MOTION for Extension of Time (Unopposed); All related filings to motion should be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
June 30, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #1 COMPLAINT, #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Unopposed) by Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC. (Mallette, Pope) Modified on 7/1/2021 (jla).
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 8/11/2021 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/30/2021. (rtc)
June 30, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE STATEMENT . (Mayo, J.)
June 30, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Andrew Mauldin on behalf of Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Mauldin, John)
June 30, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Pope S. Mallette on behalf of Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Mallette, Pope)
June 30, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Cal Mayo, Jr on behalf of Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC (Mayo, J.)
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC (jla)
June 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Scott Jones on behalf of Misemer Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Arun Kapoor Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC served on 6/3/2021. (Jones, Michael)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/11/2021. (jwr)
June 10, 2021 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT of Plaintiffs' #5 Motion to Seal Exhibits filed by Arun Kapoor, Misemer Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Jones, Michael) Modified on 6/11/2021 to link to motion (jwr).
June 10, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Seal Document (Exhibits) by Arun Kapoor, Misemer Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Jones, Michael)
May 25, 2021 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Arun Kapoor, Misemer Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Anzenberger, Timothy)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Arun Kapoor, Misemer Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Anzenberger, Timothy)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1951362, filed by Misemer Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Arun Kapoor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Arbitration Demand, #2 Exhibit B - Virtus Agreement, #3 Exhibit C - Misemer Agreement, #4 Exhibit D - November 25 Letter, #5 Exhibit E - Notice Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Cease and Desist Letter, #7 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
May 25, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Misemer Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al v. Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misemer Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Scott Jones
Represented By: Timothy J. Anzenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arun Kapoor
Represented By: Michael Scott Jones
Represented By: Timothy J. Anzenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virtus Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Represented By: John Andrew Mauldin
Represented By: Pope S. Mallette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?