White et al v. City of Hernando et al
Plaintiff: Linda White and Kathryn Bonds
Defendant: City of Hernando, Scott Worsham, Officer Lynn Brown and John Does 1-25
Case Number: 3:2021cv00162
Filed: July 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Murray B. Wells on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Wells, Murray)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Murray B. Wells. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/15/21. (jla)
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Murray Wells,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-1998587) by Kathryn Bonds, Linda White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Zummach, Martin)
August 25, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Linda White, Kathryn Bonds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Zummach, Martin)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Lynn Brown answer due 10/4/2021; City of Hernando answer due 10/4/2021; Scott Worsham answer due 10/4/2021.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/12/21. (jla)
August 10, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Todd Butler on behalf of Lynn Brown, City of Hernando, Scott Worsham (Butler, Gregory)
August 10, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed by Lynn Brown, City of Hernando, Scott Worsham. (Bland, Mallory)
July 26, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lynn Brown, City of Hernando, Scott Worsham; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
July 26, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1976163, filed by Linda White, Kathryn Bonds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
July 26, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. City of Hernando et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda White
Represented By: Martin Zummach
Represented By: Murray B. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Bonds
Represented By: Martin Zummach
Represented By: Murray B. Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hernando
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Mallory Kaye Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Worsham
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Mallory Kaye Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Lynn Brown
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Mallory Kaye Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?