Buggs et al v. Walker et al
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Buggs and Travis Buggs
Defendant: Danisha L. Walker and Hertz Vehicle, LLC
Case Number: 3:2021cv00178
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2021 Filing 22 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Amended Answers to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Request for Production of Document by Brandon S. Leslie on behalf of Jo Ann Buggs, Travis Buggs to Defendants. (Leslie, Brandon)
September 23, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Travis Buggs by Ross Douglas Vaughn on behalf of Danisha L. Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Document Request) (Vaughn, Ross)
September 23, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE to Take Deposition of Jo Ann Buggs by Ross Douglas Vaughn on behalf of Danisha L. Walker (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Document Request) (Vaughn, Ross)
September 22, 2021 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Ross Douglas Vaughn on behalf of Danisha L. Walker to Travis Buggs. (Vaughn, Ross)
September 22, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories by Ross Douglas Vaughn on behalf of Danisha L. Walker to Travis Buggs. (Vaughn, Ross)
September 22, 2021 Filing 17 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Ross Douglas Vaughn on behalf of Danisha L. Walker to Jo Ann Buggs. (Vaughn, Ross)
September 22, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories by Ross Douglas Vaughn on behalf of Danisha L. Walker to Jo Ann Buggs. (Vaughn, Ross)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/21/2021. (rtc)
September 21, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2022 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
September 20, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Answers to Defendant Walker's First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Brandon S. Leslie on behalf of Jo Ann Buggs, Travis Buggs to Defendants. (Leslie, Brandon)
September 20, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 11/14/2022 09:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before District Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 5 days) (spw)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER regarding settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/20/21. (rtc)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2022 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 6/23/2022. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 10/20/2021. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 3/23/2022. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 4/25/2022. Motions due by 7/14/2022. Settlement Conference set for 12/20/2021 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 9/20/21. (rtc)
September 20, 2021 Filing 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 9/20/2021. (rtc)
September 10, 2021 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Hertz Vehicle, LLC (jla)
September 10, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Danisha L. Walker; filed in State Court, see Doc #6 . (jla)
September 7, 2021 Filing 6 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Docket Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Summons Issued, #4 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Exhibit Summons Returned Executed, #6 Exhibit Answer, #7 Exhibit Motion to Extend Disc., #8 Exhibit Motion to Compel Waiver of Medical Privilege, #9 Exhibit NOS of Walker's Disc. to Pls) (Vaughn, Ross)
September 7, 2021 CLERK'S THIRD NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 State Court Record - Removal; Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket Entry #1 . (jla)
August 30, 2021 CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 State Court Record - Removal; Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket Entry #1 . (jla)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosures by Ross Douglas Vaughn on behalf of Danisha L. Walker to Plaintiffs. (Vaughn, Ross)
August 18, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #4 State Court Record - Removal; Attorney to refile State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b) and as described in Docket Entry #1 . (jla)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Vaughn, Ross)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 9/20/2021 11:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/11/2021. (rtc)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jo Ann Buggs, Travis Buggs. (jwr)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Danisha L. Walker from Circuit Court of Marshall County, Mississippi, case number CV2021-119. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-1983175) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Danisha L. Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court File, #2 Exhibit 2021 LLC Annual Report, #3 Exhibit Exhibit Evidence of Damages, #4 Exhibit Court Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
August 10, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buggs et al v. Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jo Ann Buggs
Represented By: Brandon S. Leslie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Buggs
Represented By: Brandon S. Leslie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danisha L. Walker
Represented By: Ross Douglas Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hertz Vehicle, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?