Smith v. City of Oxford, Mississippi et al
Plaintiff: Michael Smith
Defendant: City of Oxford, Mississippi, Jeff McCutchen, Officer James Jenkins, Officer Kandice Beaver and Jail Employees' John Does 1-5
Case Number: 3:2021cv00179
Filed: August 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Neal B Biggers
Referring Judge: Michael P Mills
2 Judge: Roy Percy
3 Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. City of Oxford, Mississippi answer due 10/25/2021; Jeff McCutchen answer due 10/25/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/14/2021. (jwr)
September 7, 2021 Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Magistrate Judge Roy Percy no longer assigned to the case. (jtm)
September 2, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by City of Oxford, Mississippi, Jeff McCutchen. (Bland, Mallory)
September 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mallory Kaye Bland on behalf of Kandice Beaver, City of Oxford, Mississippi, James Jenkins, Jeff McCutchen (Bland, Mallory)
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Gregory Todd Butler on behalf of Kandice Beaver, City of Oxford, Mississippi, James Jenkins, Jeff McCutchen (Butler, Gregory)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; James Jenkins waiver sent on 9/1/2021. (Moore, Carlos)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed ; Kandice Beaver waiver sent on 9/1/2021. (Moore, Carlos)
August 27, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Michael Smith Jeff McCutchen served on 8/25/2021. (Moore, Carlos)
August 27, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Carlos Eugene Moore on behalf of Michael Smith City of Oxford, Mississippi served on 8/25/2021. (Moore, Carlos)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers recused. Case reassigned to District Judge Michael P. Mills for all further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Neal B. Biggers on 8/16/21. (jla)
August 11, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kandice Beaver, City of Oxford, Mississippi, James Jenkins, Jeff McCutchen; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
August 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-1984058, filed by Michael Smith. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
August 11, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Biggers and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. City of Oxford, Mississippi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Smith
Represented By: Carlos Eugene Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Oxford, Mississippi
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Mallory Kaye Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff McCutchen
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Mallory Kaye Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer James Jenkins
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Mallory Kaye Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Kandice Beaver
Represented By: Gregory Todd Butler
Represented By: Mallory Kaye Bland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jail Employees' John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?