Abraham House of God and Cemetary, Inc. et al v. City of Horn Lake et al
Plaintiff: Abraham House of God and Cemetary, Inc., Mr. Property, LLC, Riyadh Elkhayyat and Maher Abuirshaid
Defendant: City of Horn Lake, Board of Aldermen of the City of Horn Lake, Planning Commission of the City of Horn Lake and Allen B. Latimer
Case Number: 3:2021cv00231
Filed: November 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Office: Oxford Division Office
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Board of Aldermen of the City of Horn Lake, City of Horn Lake, Allen B. Latimer, Planning Commission of the City of Horn Lake. (Campbell, Billy)
November 30, 2021 Filing 21 NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #20 Initial Order - Rule 16.1; Amended Rule 16 Initial Order (Correcting the Style of the Case) (rtc) Modified on 12/1/2021 (jla).
November 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 1/18/2022 11:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/30/2021. (rtc)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer All Defendants.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/29/21. (bnd)
November 26, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Joshua Fiyenn Tom on behalf of Abraham House of God and Cemetary, Inc., Maher Abuirshaid, Riyadh Elkhayyat, Mr. Property, LLC to Defendants Horn Lake, et al.. (Tom, Joshua)
November 23, 2021 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Board of Aldermen of the City of Horn Lake, City of Horn Lake, Allen B. Latimer, Planning Commission of the City of Horn Lake. (Campbell, Billy)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Heather L. Weaver. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/5/21. (bnd)
November 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Daniel Mach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/5/21. (bnd)
November 5, 2021 Filing 14 EXHIBIT re #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Heather Weaver,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2023151) Certificate of Good Standing. (Thames, Landon)
November 5, 2021 Filing 13 EXHIBIT re #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Daniel Mach,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2023155) Certificate of Good Standing. (Thames, Landon)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Avia Gridi. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/5/21. (bnd)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Janet A. Gochman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/5/21. (bnd)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Jonathan K. Youngwood. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/5/21. (bnd)
November 5, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Board of Aldermen of the City of Horn Lake answer due 11/24/2021; Planning Commission of the City of Horn Lake answer due 11/24/2021. (jla)
November 4, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Landon P. Thames on behalf of Riyadh Elkhayyat, Abraham House of God and Cemetary, Inc., Mr. Property, LLC, Maher Abuirshaid All Defendants. (Thames, Landon)
November 4, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Daniel Mach,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2023155) by Abraham House of God and Cemetary, Inc., Maher Abuirshaid, Riyadh Elkhayyat, Mr. Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Additional Court Admissions for Daniel Mach, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Thames, Landon)
November 4, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Heather Weaver,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2023151) by Abraham House of God and Cemetary, Inc., Maher Abuirshaid, Riyadh Elkhayyat, Mr. Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Additional Court Admissions for Heather Weaver, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Thames, Landon)
November 4, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Avia Gridi,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2023143) by Abraham House of God and Cemetary, Inc., Maher Abuirshaid, Riyadh Elkhayyat, Mr. Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Thames, Landon)
November 4, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Janet Gochman,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2023141) by Abraham House of God and Cemetary, Inc., Maher Abuirshaid, Riyadh Elkhayyat, Mr. Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Thames, Landon)
November 4, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jonathan Youngwood,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2023136) by Abraham House of God and Cemetary, Inc., Maher Abuirshaid, Riyadh Elkhayyat, Mr. Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Thames, Landon)
November 4, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Daniel Mach; Please file a certificate of good standing from the New York state licensing authority by using the civil event "Exhibits to Other Documents" and linking to original motion. (jla)
November 4, 2021 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Heather Weaver; Please file a certificate of good standing from the California state licensing authority by using the civil event "Exhibits to Other Documents" and linking to original motion. (jla)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 11/3/2021. (rmw)
November 3, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr)
November 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2022114, filed by Riyadh Elkhayyat, Abraham House of God and Cemetary, Inc., Mr. Property, LLC, Maher Abuirshaid. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
November 3, 2021 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abraham House of God and Cemetary, Inc. et al v. City of Horn Lake et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abraham House of God and Cemetary, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua Fiyenn Tom
Represented By: Landon P. Thames
Represented By: Avia Gridi
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Heather L. Weaver
Represented By: Janet A. Gochman
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. Property, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Fiyenn Tom
Represented By: Landon P. Thames
Represented By: Avia Gridi
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Heather L. Weaver
Represented By: Janet A. Gochman
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Riyadh Elkhayyat
Represented By: Joshua Fiyenn Tom
Represented By: Landon P. Thames
Represented By: Avia Gridi
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Heather L. Weaver
Represented By: Janet A. Gochman
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maher Abuirshaid
Represented By: Joshua Fiyenn Tom
Represented By: Landon P. Thames
Represented By: Avia Gridi
Represented By: Daniel Mach
Represented By: Heather L. Weaver
Represented By: Janet A. Gochman
Represented By: Jonathan K. Youngwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Horn Lake
Represented By: Billy C. Campbell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Aldermen of the City of Horn Lake
Represented By: Billy C. Campbell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planning Commission of the City of Horn Lake
Represented By: Billy C. Campbell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen B. Latimer
Represented By: Billy C. Campbell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?