Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC v. Sensory Path Inc., et al
Plaintiff: Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC
Defendant: Sensory Path Inc., Holly S. Clay and Madison Barker
Case Number: 3:2022cv00032
Filed: February 17, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Glen H Davidson
Referring Judge: Michael P Mills
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Filing 72 AMENDED / SUPPLEMENT TO DOCUMENT Amendment to (159 in 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, 69 in 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP) Response to Motion,,, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email chain between McDavid and Mayo 04.06.2022, #2 Exhibit B - Email chain between Mayo and Berger)Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP (Mauldin, John)
April 6, 2022 Filing 71 REPLY to Response to Motion re ( #58 in 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP, 146 in 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP) MOTION to Extend CMO Deadlines filed by Sensory Path Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: James Berger Deposition Transcript and Exhibits, #2 Exhibit B: Gemstone Foods Case Brief)Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP (McDavid, Stephan) Modified on 4/8/2022 (cb).
March 31, 2022 Filing 70 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Privilege Log by Stephan L. McDavid on behalf of Sensory Path Inc. to Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC and Pamela A. Gunther. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP (McDavid, Stephan)
March 25, 2022 Filing 69 RESPONSE to Motion re (58 in 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP, 146 in 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP) MOTION to Extend CMO Deadlines filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC, Pamela A. Gunther. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPTO Request for Extension, #2 Exhibit Emails between McDavid and Berger, #3 Exhibit Ltr from Berger to McDavid dated 12.18.2020, #4 Exhibit Ltrs from Berger dated 02.16.2022, #5 Exhibit Berger Depo Transcript 03.03.2022, #6 Exhibit Pl's Rule 26 Expert Witness Disclosure, #7 Exhibit Emails between McDavid and Berger, #8 Exhibit McDavid Depo Transcript 03.02.2022, #9 Exhibit McDavid Depo Exhibits 03.02.2022, #10 Exhibit Berger Depo Exhibits 03.03.2022, #11 Exhibit Berger Invoice 03.03.2022, #12 Exhibit Emails between McDavid and Mayo re Invoice 03.04.2022, #13 Exhibit Order Granting Pl's Emergency Mtn for Leave to Sub Expert)Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP (Mayo, J.)
March 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying (142) Motion to Compel; finding as moot (150) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/24/22. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP (bnd)
March 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 AMENDED ORDER RESETTING DEADLINES Discovery due by 8/8/2022. Motions due by 9/9/2022. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 2/3/2022. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 3/4/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/11/22. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP (bnd)
March 11, 2022 Filing 66 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Status Conference held on 3/11/2022. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP (rtc)
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 TEXT ORDER finding as moot (146) Motion to Extend CMO in case 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, (58) Motion to Extend CMO in case 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP. See Docket (154) in 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, (64) in 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/10/22. (no document attached) Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP (bnd) Modified on 3/11/2022 (jla).
March 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Discovery due by 8/8/2022. Motions due by 9/9/2022. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 5/9/2022. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 6/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/10/22. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP (bnd)
March 9, 2022 Filing 63 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2022 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP (rtc)
March 9, 2022 Filing 62 RESPONSE in Opposition re (150 in 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP) MOTION for Leave to File Sur-reply in Opposition re (142) Motion to Compel filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC and Pamela A. Gunther, (142 in 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP) MOTION to Compel filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC, Pamela A. Gunther. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP (Mauldin, John)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 61 TEXT ORDER: ALL DOCUMENTS IN THE CONSOLIDATED CASSES SHALL BE FILED IN THE LEAD CASE AND SPREAD ON THE DOCKET OF THE RELATED CASE IN THE COURT'S ELECTRONIC CASE MANAGEMENT SYSTEM, UNLESS THE COURT DIRECTS OTHERWISE. No further written order shall issue from the court. (No document attached) Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/9/22. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP (bnd) Modified on 3/10/2022 (jla).
March 9, 2022 Filing 60 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 1/9/2023 09:30 AM in Oxford Courtroom 1 before Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. (jla)
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 138 Motion to Continue (Motion filed in lead case 3:19cv219). Signed by Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson on 3/8/22. (jla)
March 7, 2022 Filing 58 MOTION to Extend CMO Deadlines by Holly Clay, Sensory Path Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Berger C.V., #2 Exhibit B: McDavid Declaration)Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP (McDavid, Stephan)
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 57 TEXT ONLY ORDER granting (144) Motion for Leave to File Document in case 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/4/22. (no document attached) Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP (bnd) Modified on 3/4/2022 (jla).
March 3, 2022 Filing 56 ANSWER to (28 in 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP) Amended Complaint with Jury Demand by Madison Barker, Holly S. Clay, Sensory Path Inc..Associated Cases: 3:22-cv-00032-GHD-RP, 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP (McDavid, Stephan) Modified on 3/4/2022 (jla).
February 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER consolidating case with 3:22cv32-GHD-RP. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/22/22. Associated Cases: 3:19-cv-00219-GHD-RP, 3:22-cv-00032-MPM-RP (jla)
February 22, 2022 Case reassigned to Senior Judge Glen H. Davidson. Senior Judge Michael P. Mills no longer assigned to the case. (jla)
February 21, 2022 Filing 54 Consent MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Madison Barker, Holly S. Clay, Sensory Path Inc.. (McDavid, Stephan)
February 18, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by J. Cal Mayo, Jr on behalf of Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC (Mayo, J.)
February 18, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Andrew Mauldin on behalf of Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC (Mauldin, John)
February 17, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Stephan L. McDavid on behalf of All Defendants (McDavid, Stephan)
February 17, 2022 Filing 50 CLERK'S NOTICE of Failure by Counsel to be Admitted to Practice as to Arthur R. Lehman, Celeste M. Butera, Mark E. Baron, Robert Rowan, and Sheryl DeLuca (jla)
February 17, 2022 Filing 49 Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 7:19-cv-11697. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
February 17, 2022 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
January 12, 2022 CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Northern District of Mississippi. (ate) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 OPINION & ORDER re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer. filed by Sensory Path Inc., Madison Barker, Holly S. Clay. For the foregoing reasons, Defendants' motion to dismiss or transfer is GRANTED with respect to Defendants' request to transfer the instant action to the Northern District of Mississippi. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate the motion at ECF No. 36. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 1/12/2022) (ate) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
October 13, 2021 Filing 47 LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Celeste M. Butera dated October 13, 2021 re: Mississippi Summary Judgment Decision. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC..(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
October 12, 2021 Filing 46 LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Arthur R. Lehman dated 10/12/2021 re: Motion to Transfer or Stay. Document filed by Madison Barker, Holly S. Clay, Sensory Path Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order of Mississippi Court, #2 Exhibit Opinion of Mississippi Court).(Lehman, Arthur) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
July 19, 2021 Filing 45 LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Celeste M. Butera dated July 19, 2021 re: additional information regarding convenience factors. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
June 10, 2021 Filing 44 LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Arthur R. Lehman dated June 10, 2021 re: Letter from plaintiff's counsel dated June 9, 2021. Document filed by Madison Barker, Holly S. Clay, Sensory Path Inc...(Lehman, Arthur) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
June 9, 2021 Filing 43 LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Celeste M. Butera dated June 9, 2021 re: additional information regarding convenience factors. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
January 25, 2021 Filing 42 LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Celeste M. Butera dated January 25, 2021 re: pending motion to transfer. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC..(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 41 DECLARATION of Pamela A. Gunther in Opposition re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer.. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Gunther, #2 Exhibit 2 Gunther, #3 Exhibit 3 Gunther, #4 Exhibit 4 Gunther, #5 Exhibit 5 Gunther, #6 Exhibit 6 Gunther, #7 Exhibit 7 Gunther, #8 Exhibit 8 Gunther, #9 Exhibit 9 Gunther, #10 Exhibit 10 Gunther, #11 Exhibit 11 Gunther, #12 Exhibit 12 Gunther, #13 Exhibit 13 Gunther, #14 Exhibit 14 Gunther).(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 40 DECLARATION of Sheryl DeLuca in Opposition re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer.. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A DeLuca, #2 Exhibit B DeLuca, #3 Exhibit C DeLuca).(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 39 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer. . Document filed by Madison Barker, Holly S. Clay, Sensory Path Inc...(Lehman, Arthur) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 38 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer. . Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC..(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #36 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer. . Document filed by Madison Barker, Holly S. Clay, Sensory Path Inc...(Lehman, Arthur) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
January 19, 2021 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer. Document filed by Madison Barker, Holly S. Clay, Sensory Path Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Holly Clay, #2 Affidavit Lehman affirmation through Exh B, #3 Exhibit Lehman affirmation Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Lehman affirmation Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Lehman affirmation Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Lehman affirmation Exhibit F-F-13, #7 Exhibit Lehman azffirmation Exhibit F-14 end).(Lehman, Arthur) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 35 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,, served. Madison Barker served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. Service was accepted by Holly S. Clay Co-Defendant. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC..(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
November 13, 2020 Filing 34 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Amended Complaint,,, served. Holly S. Clay served on 11/9/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. Service was accepted by Holly S. Clay Defendant. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC..(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 33 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Holly S. Clay. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
November 6, 2020 Filing 32 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Madison Barker. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
November 6, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Celeste M. Butera. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Holly S. Clay; Madison Barker. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (sj) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 31 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Madison Barker, re: #28 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC..(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 30 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Holly S. Clay, re: #28 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC..(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 29 EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: #28 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC..(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
November 5, 2020 Filing 28 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against Madison Barker, Holly S. Clay, Sensory Path Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22).(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
November 5, 2020 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents All Defendants added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint,,.Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,,..(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
November 4, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Celeste M. Butera to RE-FILE Document No. #25 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): summons request was not processed due to deficient pleading;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
November 4, 2020 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Celeste M. Butera to RE-FILE re: Document No. #25 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; add parties Holly S. Clay and Madison Barker; all of the parties whom the pleading is against were not selected; the pleading is deficient on the due date, therefore Court's leave must be granted. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event list Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
November 2, 2020 Filing 27 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Madison Barker, re: #25 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC..(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
November 2, 2020 Filing 26 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Holly S. Clay, re: #25 Amended Complaint,,,. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC..(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
November 2, 2020 Filing 25 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint,, against Sensory Path Inc. with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. Related document: #1 Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit Exhibit 22).(Butera, Celeste) Modified on 11/4/2020 (jgo). [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
October 21, 2020 Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause is so redesignated. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
October 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER terminating #11 Letter Motion for Conference ; denying as moot #14 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document; granting #21 Letter Motion for Conference ; terminating #22 Letter Motion for Conference. Plaintiff commenced the instant action on or about December 20, 2019, asserting claims sounding in, inter alia, copyright infringement. (ECF No. 1.) By letter dated March 2, 2020, Defendant sought leave of Court to move to dismiss the complaint on the basis that it had previously commenced an action in the United States District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi entitled Sensory Path Inc. v. Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC and Pamela A. Gunther, Case No. 3:19cv219 (the "Mississippi Action"), which is currently pending, involving similar facts and claims. (ECF No. 11.) Defendant asserts that the instant action (the "New York Action") is duplicative of the Mississippi Action. Plaintiff opposes Defendant's application and seeks leave of Court to file an amended complaint. (ECF No. 21.) In reply, Defendant opposes Plaintiff's application, and in the alternative, should Plaintiff be granted leave to amend its complaint, states that Defendant will nevertheless seek leave of Court to move to dismiss. (ECF No. 22.) Based on the foregoing, the parties are directed as follows: Plaintiff is directed to serve and file an amended complaint no later than November 2, 2020; Defendant is directed to file a responsive pleading or serve (not file) its anticipated motion to dismiss the amended complaint no later than December 2, 2020; Plaintiff is directed to serve (not file) its opposition to the motion to dismiss no later than January 4, 2021; Defendant is directed to serve its reply papers no later than January 19, 2021. The parties are directed to file all motion documents on the reply date, Janua1y 19, 2021. Each party shall provide two (2) copies of its respective motion documents to Chambers on the date the documents are served upon its adversary. As long as the Court's Emergency Rules remain in place, counsel shall also provide the Court with an electronic copy of their respective papers on the due dates. In the event Defendant does not move to dismiss Plaintiff's amended complaint, Defendant must file an answer within fifteen (15) days of the filing of Plaintiff's amended pleading. Within fifteen (15) days of the filing of the answer, the parties shall confer and submit a proposed Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling order (form attached). Plaintiff's letter motion (ECF No. 14) for leave to file a revised response to Defendant's letter motion at ECF No. 11 is denied as moot. The Clerk of the Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motions at ECF Nos. 11, 14, 21, and 22. (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 10/20/20) (yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
October 20, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 11/2/2020. Motions due by 1/19/2021. Responses due by 1/19/2021. Replies due by 1/19/2021. Service due by 11/2/2020. (yv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
September 11, 2020 Filing 22 LETTER MOTION for Conference in response to Letter Motion by plaintiff dated September 10, 2020 addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Arthur R. Lehman dated September 11, 2020. Document filed by Sensory Path Inc...(Lehman, Arthur) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
September 10, 2020 Filing 21 LETTER MOTION for Conference seeking leave to file Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Celeste M. Butera dated September 10, 2020. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC..(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 23 LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Celeste M. Butera dated 9/4/2020 re: We write to respectfully inform the Court of a decision involving the parties in this action rendered by the Court in in the Northern District of Mississippi, entitled Sensory Path Inc. v. Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC and Pamela A. Gunther. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (jwh) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
September 4, 2020 Filing 20 LETTER addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Arthur R. Lehman dated September 4, 2020 re: Response to letter dated 9/4/20 of Celeste Butera, Esq.. Document filed by Sensory Path Inc...(Lehman, Arthur) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
May 9, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Arthur R. Lehman on behalf of Sensory Path Inc.. New Address: Arthur R. Lehman, L.L.C., 60 East 42nd Street, Suite 4600, New York, New York, United States 10165, 2126972715..(Lehman, Arthur) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #15 Motion for Robert Allen Rowan to Appear Pro Hac Vice. SO ORDERED. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 15). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/13/2020) (va) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #16 Motion for Sherl Lee De Luca to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Clerk of the Court requested to terminate the motion (doc. 16). (Signed by Judge Nelson Stephen Roman on 3/13/2020) (va) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Sheryl Lee De Luca to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19095578. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(DeLuca, Sheryl) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
March 12, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #16 MOTION for Sheryl Lee De Luca to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19095578. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
March 11, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Robert Allen Rowan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19081997. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificates of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Rowan, Robert) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
March 11, 2020 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #15 MOTION for Robert Allen Rowan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19081997. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (vba) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
March 6, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Revised Response to Letter Motion at Docket 11 to replace Dockt 13 addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Celeste M. Butera dated March 6, 2020. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Response to Letter Motion, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C).(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 13 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Celeste M. Butera dated March 5, 2020 re: #11 LETTER MOTION for Conference pre-motion addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Arthur Lehman dated 03/02/2020. . Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C).(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mark E Baron on behalf of Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC..(Baron, Mark) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 11 LETTER MOTION for Conference pre-motion addressed to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman from Arthur Lehman dated 03/02/2020. Document filed by Sensory Path Inc...(Lehman, Arthur) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
February 20, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Arthur R. Lehman on behalf of Sensory Path Inc...(Lehman, Arthur) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Sensory Path Inc. waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY (SEE DOCUMENT #12) - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Celeste M. Butera on behalf of Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Butera, Celeste) Modified on 3/11/2020 (ldi). [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
January 2, 2020 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Celeste M. Butera on behalf of Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Butera, Celeste) Modified on 3/11/2020 (ldi). [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sensory Path Inc.. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
December 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Nelson Stephen Roman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
December 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
December 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
December 23, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Celeste M. Butera. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Putnam. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Nassau. (pne) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sensory Path Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Celeste M. Butera re: that this action be filed as related to 3:19-cv-219-GHD-RP. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC.(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC.(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.] (Main Document 2 replaced with flattened pdf version of same on 2/17/2022) (jla).
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sensory Path Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-18334355)Document filed by Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit Exhibit 21)(Butera, Celeste) [Transferred from New York Southern on 2/17/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC v. Sensory Path Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fit and Fun Playscapes LLC
Represented By: Robert Rowan
Represented By: Mark E Baron
Represented By: Sheryl DeLuca
Represented By: Celeste M. Butera
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Represented By: John Andrew Mauldin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sensory Path Inc.
Represented By: Arthur R. Lehman
Represented By: Stephan L. McDavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holly S. Clay
Represented By: Arthur R. Lehman
Represented By: Stephan L. McDavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison Barker
Represented By: Arthur R. Lehman
Represented By: Stephan L. McDavid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?