Essary v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: Shelley Essary
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 3:2022cv00187
Filed: August 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: David A Sanders
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2022 Filing 9 EXHIBIT re #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #6 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #8 Summons Returned Executed as to USA . (Carlton, Keith)
September 26, 2022 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Kilolo Kijakazi answer due 10/29/2022. (jla)
September 26, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #7 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #6 Summons Returned Executed as to USA, #8 Summons Returned Executed as to USA; Administrative Procedures Section 3(A)(8) states that all documents are to be converted to a PDF format. Attorney is directed to flatten issued summons and refile using the event "Exhibits to Other Document" and linking to Docs 6, 7, and 8. (jla)
September 21, 2022 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith S. Carlton on behalf of Shelley Essary (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Carlton, Keith)
September 21, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith S. Carlton on behalf of Shelley Essary (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Carlton, Keith)
September 21, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith S. Carlton on behalf of Shelley Essary (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Carlton, Keith)
September 21, 2022 CLERK'S NOTICE OF CORRECTION re #5 Summons Returned Executed, #4 Summons Returned Executed, #3 Summons Returned Executed ; Attorney to refile return to include copy of issued summons using the event 'Summons Returned Executed as to USA' (jla)
September 20, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith S. Carlton on behalf of Shelley Essary (Carlton, Keith)
September 20, 2022 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith S. Carlton on behalf of Shelley Essary (Carlton, Keith)
September 20, 2022 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Keith S. Carlton on behalf of Shelley Essary Kilolo Kijakazi served on 8/30/2022. (Carlton, Keith)
August 29, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
August 29, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2135922, filed by Shelley Essary. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
August 29, 2022 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Sanders. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Essary v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley Essary
Represented By: Bobby R. Wood
Represented By: Keith S. Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?