Mack v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Terry Mack
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2022cv00210
Filed: September 28, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Answer due 12/29/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/22/2022. (nih)
November 22, 2022 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer [Unopposed] by Commissioner of Social Security. (Gough, John)
October 21, 2022 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/30/2022. (jwr)
September 29, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General; forwarded to USM for service. (jla)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 09/28/2022. (nih)
September 28, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terry Mack. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Form AO 240, #3 EAJA Limited Power of Attorney) (jla)
September 28, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Terry Mack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
September 28, 2022 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mack v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Mack
Represented By: Joe Morgan Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John E. Gough, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?