Grayson v. Harwell et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Massengill Grayson
Defendant: Derricka Harwell and John Does 1-10
Counter Claimant: Antario Harwell
Counter Defendant: Ashley Massengil, Digital Course Recipe, LLC, Credit Cake and John Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2023cv00005
Filed: January 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 STATUS REPORT . (Kellum, William)
September 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 STATUS REPORT File by Defendants Harwell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Morris, Daniel)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER STAYING CASE and DISMISSING AS MOOT MOTION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/17/23. (rrh)
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Kellum, William)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 8/16/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/9/2023. (yf)
August 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying #90 Motion to Strike; finding as moot #91 Motion for Sanctions; granting #101 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 8/9/2023. (yf)
August 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Settlement Conference held on 8/8/2023. (rtc)
August 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MOTION to Withdraw #91 MOTION for Sanctions by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 100 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Responses to Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents by Daniel Ellis Morris on behalf of Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell, Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10 to Plaintiff, Ashley Massengil Grayson. (Morris, Daniel)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #98 Reply to Response to Motion re #90 MOTION to Strike filed by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William) Modified to link to underlying motion on 8/2/2023 (jla).
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 98 REPLY to Response to Motion re #90 MOTION to Strike #85 Response to Motion filed by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William)
August 2, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE re #99 Memorandum in Support; All related filings to motion must be linked back to the original motion instead of a responsive pleading. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 97 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #91 MOTION for Sanctions Response in Opposition filed by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10. (Morris, Daniel)
July 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 96 RESPONSE in Opposition re #91 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Morris, Daniel)
July 25, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE re #95 Memorandum in Support; All related filings to motion must be linked back to the original motion instead of a responsive pleading. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 95 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #94 Response in Opposition to Motion re #90 MOTION to Strike Response to Motion re #82 MOTION to Accommodate filed by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10. (Morris, Daniel) Modified on 7/25/2023 (jla).
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 94 RESPONSE in Opposition re #90 MOTION to Strike #85 Response to Motion re #82 MOTION to Accommodate filed by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Origins Correspondence, #2 Exhibit B - Email Thread) (Morris, Daniel) Modified on 7/25/2023 (jla).
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #92 MOTION to Extend CMO Deadlines filed by Credit Cake, Digital Course Recipe, LLC, Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William)
July 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MOTION to Extend CMO Deadlines by Credit Cake, Digital Course Recipe, LLC, Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MOTION for Sanctions by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email between Court Clerk, Defense counsel, and Plaintiff Counsel) (Kellum, William)
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MOTION to Strike #85 Response to Motion re #82 MOTION To Accommodate by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email between Court Clerk, Defense counsel, and Plaintiff Counsel) (Kellum, William) Modified to link to underlying motion on 7/24/2023 (jla).
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #91 MOTION for Sanctions filed by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kellum, William) Modified to link to refiled Motion on 7/24/2023 (jla).
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 88 DISREGARD ENTRY -- REFILED AT DOC 91 MOTION for Sanctions by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kellum, William) Modified on 7/24/2023 (jla).
July 21, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE re #86 MOTION to Strike #85 Response to Motion , #88 MOTION for Sanctions : Attorney to refile motions with the exhibit(s) identified with an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2). Further, exhibits should only be filed with motion and not the memorandum brief as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2). (jwr)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #86 MOTION to Strike #85 Response to Motion filed by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kellum, William)
July 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 86 MOTION to Strike #85 Response to Motion by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Kellum, William)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 85 RESPONSE to Motion re #82 MOTION To Accommodate filed by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.1-A.2: Indictment, #2 Exhibit B: Conditions of Release) (Morris, Daniel)
July 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #82 Motion to Accommodate. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/19/2023. (yf)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint - State Court, Counterclaim by Credit Cake, Digital Course Recipe, LLC, Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William)
July 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MOTION To Accommodate by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Kellum, William)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting #50 Motion to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default as to counter-defendant Ashley Massengil; granting #52 MOTION for Leave to File Answer; granting #55 MOTION for Leave to File Answer; granting #58 MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Entry of Default as to counter defendants Credit Cake, Digital Course Recipe, LLC; denying #57 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashley Massengill, Credit Cake, and Digital Course Recipe, LLC; granting #63 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ; granting #72 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 7/17/23. (jla)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #79 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Credit Cake, Digital Course Recipe, LLC. (Kellum, William)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPLY to Response to Motion re #55 MOTION for Leave to File Answer filed by Credit Cake, Digital Course Recipe, LLC. (Kellum, William)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #77 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Credit Cake, Digital Course Recipe, LLC. (Kellum, William)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 REPLY to Response to Motion re #50 MOTION to Set Aside #47 Clerk's Entry of Default, #46 Order on Motion for Entry of Default,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,, Order on Motion to Extend CMO Deadlines, filed by Credit Cake, Digital Course Recipe, LLC. (Kellum, William)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 76 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #75 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REPLY to Response to Motion re #58 MOTION to Set Aside #49 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #73 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William)
July 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 73 REPLY to Response to Motion re #52 MOTION for Leave to File Answer filed by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10. (Morris, Daniel)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #56 Memorandum in Support, #55 MOTION for Leave to File Answer . (Morris, Daniel)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 70 RESPONSE in Opposition re #55 MOTION for Leave to File Answer filed by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10. (Morris, Daniel)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #53 Memorandum in Support, #52 MOTION for Leave to File Answer . (Morris, Daniel)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 RESPONSE in Opposition re #52 MOTION for Leave to File Answer filed by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10. (Morris, Daniel)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #58 MOTION to Set Aside #49 Clerk's Entry of Default , #59 Memorandum in Support . (Morris, Daniel)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Set Aside #49 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FBI INDICTMENT, #2 Exhibit B-GRAYSON SOCIAL MEDIA POSTS) (Morris, Daniel)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #51 Memorandum in Support, #50 MOTION to Set Aside #47 Clerk's Entry of Default, #46 Order on Motion for Entry of Default,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,, Order on Motion to Extend CMO Deadlines, . (Morris, Daniel)
July 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 64 RESPONSE in Opposition re #50 MOTION to Set Aside #47 Clerk's Entry of Default, #46 Order on Motion for Entry of Default,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,, Order on Motion to Extend CMO Deadlines, filed by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FBI INDICTMENT, #2 Exhibit B-GRAYSON SOCIAL MEDIA POSTS) (Morris, Daniel)
July 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 63 First MOTION for Extension of Time to file responses to, MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #54 Response in Opposition to Motion, #58 MOTION to Set Aside #49 Clerk's Entry of Default , #53 Memorandum in Support, #60 Objection, #56 Memorandum in Support, #51 Memorandum in Support, #50 MOTION to Set Aside #47 Clerk's Entry of Default, #46 Order on Motion for Entry of Default,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,, Order on Motion to Extend CMO Deadlines, , #59 Memorandum in Support, #55 MOTION for Leave to File Answer, #52 MOTION for Leave to File Answer by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10. (Morris, Daniel)
June 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants Responses to Plaintiff's Request for Admissions by Daniel Ellis Morris on behalf of Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10 to Plaintiff/Counter-Defendants. (Morris, Daniel)
June 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 61 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Interrogatories, Request for Production of Documents and Things and Requests for Admissions to Defendant by William S. Kellum on behalf of Ashley Massengill Grayson to Derricka Harwell, et al. (Kellum, William)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Objection to #57 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashley Massengill, Credit Cake, and Digital Course Recipe, LLC . (Kellum, William)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #58 MOTION to Set Aside #49 Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Credit Cake, Digital Course Recipe, LLC. (Kellum, William)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MOTION to Set Aside #49 Clerk's Entry of Default by Credit Cake, Digital Course Recipe, LLC. (Kellum, William)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Ashley Massengill, Credit Cake, and Digital Course Recipe, LLC by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A) (Morris, Daniel)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #55 MOTION for Leave to File Answer filed by Credit Cake, Digital Course Recipe, LLC. (Kellum, William)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MOTION for Leave to File Answer by Credit Cake, Digital Course Recipe, LLC. (Kellum, William)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #48 First MOTION for Entry of Default Against Credit Cake and Digital Recipe Course LLC filed by Credit Cake, Digital Course Recipe, LLC. (Kellum, William)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #52 MOTION for Leave to File Answer filed by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MOTION for Leave to File Answer by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #50 MOTION to Set Aside #47 Clerk's Entry of Default, #46 Order on Motion for Entry of Default,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,, Order on Motion to Extend CMO Deadlines, filed by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William)
June 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 50 MOTION to Set Aside #47 Clerk's Entry of Default, #46 Order on Motion for Entry of Default,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,, Order on Motion to Extend CMO Deadlines, by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to counter defendants Credit Cake, Digital Course Recipe, LLC (jla)
June 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 48 First MOTION for Entry of Default Against Credit Cake and Digital Recipe Course LLC by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Morris, Daniel)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 47 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to counter-defendant Ashley Massengil (jla)
June 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #39 First MOTION for Entry of Default Against Ashley Massengill Grayson; granting #40 First MOTION to Strike #34 Answer to Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses; finding as moot #42 Motion to Strike; and finding as moot #45 MOTION for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/13/2023. (yf)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William) Modified on 6/13/2023 (jla).
June 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 44 REPLY to Response to Motion re #42 MOTION to Strike #41 Response to Order to Show Cause, #4 Answer to Complaint - State Court, Counterclaim filed by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 MOTION to Strike #41 Response to Order to Show Cause, #4 Answer to Complaint - State Court, Counterclaim filed by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell. (Morris, Daniel)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MOTION to Strike #41 Response to Order to Show Cause, #4 Answer to Complaint - State Court, Counterclaim by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William)
May 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Morris, Daniel)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 40 First MOTION to Strike #34 Answer to Counterclaim and Affirmative Defenses by Derricka Harwell. (Morris, Daniel)
May 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 39 First MOTION for Entry of Default Against Ashley Massengill Grayson, Et. al by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Default Judgment) (Morris, Daniel)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Credit Cake, Digital Course Recipe, LLC. (Morris, Daniel)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 37 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. (Morris, Daniel)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Ellis Morris on behalf of Derricka Harwell Digital Course Recipe, LLC served on 4/18/2023. (Morris, Daniel)
May 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Daniel Ellis Morris on behalf of Derricka Harwell Credit Cake served on 4/18/2023. (Morris, Daniel)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ANSWER to #4 Answer to Complaint - State Court, Counterclaim by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/30/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/23/2023. (yf)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Antario Harwell . (Morris, Daniel)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 5/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/16/2023. (yf)
May 16, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Ashley Massengil (re Counterclaim) (jla)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE as to Antario Harwell: Effective December 1, 2022, F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required disclosure statement. (jla)
May 15, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S SECOND NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Credit Cake and Digital Course Recipe, LLC (re Counterclaim) (jla)
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to Credit Cake and Digital Course Recipe, LLC (re Counterclaim) (jla)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 04/06/2023. (rmw)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE re #29 Memorandum in Support; All related filings to motion must be linked back to the original motion instead of a responsive pleading. Court staff has made the correction. Attorney will be directed to refile in the future. (jla)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #28 Reply to Response to Motion to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William) Modified on 3/10/2023 (jla).
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet and Order) (Kellum, William)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE re #24 Response in Opposition to Motion; disregard entry, refiled at #25 (jla)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Summons Reissued as to Credit Cake, Digital Course Recipe, LLC (re Counterclaim); emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Morris, Daniel)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Anonymous Facebook Post, #2 Exhibit B: Police.Reports, #3 Exhibit C: Dallas County Lawsuit, #4 Exhibit D: Grayson Facebook Post, #5 Exhibit E: Grayson Anonymous Post, #6 Exhibit F: Grayson Anonymous Post 2, #7 Exhibit G: Harwell v. Maclin) (Morris, Daniel)
March 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Anonymous Facebook Post, #2 Exhibit Police.Reports, #3 Exhibit Dallas County Lawsuit, #4 Exhibit Grayson Facebook Post, #5 Exhibit Grayson Anonymous Post, #6 Exhibit Grayson Anonymous Post 2, #7 Exhibit Harwell v. Maclin) (Morris, Daniel)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #22 Response in Opposition to Motion To Dismiss filed by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G) (Morris, Daniel)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10. (Morris, Daniel)
March 2, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE re #23 Memorandum in Support, #22 Response in Opposition to Motion; All exhibits should be filed with the response to which they relate and not the memorandum brief, as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2); further each exhibit must be given an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. All related filings to motion must be linked back to the original motion instead of a responsive pleading. Attorney to refile response and memorandum brief. (jla)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by William S. Kellum on behalf of Ashley Massengill Grayson to Defendant. (Kellum, William)
March 1, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE re #19 Disclosure Statement: Attorney to file only a Notice of Service as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(d)(1). (jwr)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Initial Disclosure by Daniel Ellis Morris on behalf of Antario Harwell, Derricka Harwell, Derricka Harwell to Plaintiff/Counter-Defendants. (Morris, Daniel)
February 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ashley Massengill Grayson . (Kellum, William)
February 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Kellum, William)
February 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Credit Cake, Digital Course Recipe, LLC (re Counterclaim); emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process (re Counterclaim) as to Digital Course Recipe, LLC and Credit Cake (jla)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/15/23. (rtc)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2024 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Trial: Non-Jury Trial set for 3/4/2024 9:30 AM in Oxford Courtroom 3 East before Senior Judge Michael P. Mills. (est 3 days) (spw)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER regarding settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/14/23. (rtc)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2024 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 8/15/2023. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 3/14/2023. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 5/15/2023. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 6/15/2023. Motions due by 9/5/2023. Settlement Conference set for 8/8/2023 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/14/23. (rtc)
February 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 2/14/2023. (rtc)
February 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet State Court Record, #2 Summons State Court Summons, #3 State Court Complaint State Court Complaint, #4 Summons State Court Waiver) (Morris, Daniel)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ashley Massengill Grayson, Ashley Massengil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet and Order) (Kellum, William)
February 6, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE re #7 Memorandum in Support: All exhibits should be filed with the motion to which they relate and not the memorandum brief, as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2). Attorney directed to refile motion and memorandum brief. (jwr)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Ashley Massengill Grayson, Ashley Massengil. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket Sheet Joint Order, #2 Exhibit B - Maclin's MTD, #3 Exhibit C - Maclin's Order) (Kellum, William)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Docket Sheet and Order) (Kellum, William)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 2/14/2023 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/6/23. (rtc)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Defendant's ANSWER to State Court Complaint , First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Derricka Harwell, John Does 1-10. (Morris, Daniel) Modified on 1/4/2023 (jla).
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Derricka Harwell pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2). (Morris, Daniel)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Derricka Harwell, filed by Ashley Massengill Grayson. (jla)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Derricka Harwell from Desoto County Circuit Court, case number CI2022-334GCD. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2186092) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Derricka Harwell. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
January 4, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE Effective December 1, 2022, F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required disclosure statement. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grayson v. Harwell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Massengill Grayson
Represented By: William S. Kellum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derricka Harwell
Represented By: Daniel Ellis Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Represented By: Daniel Ellis Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Antario Harwell
Represented By: Daniel Ellis Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Ashley Massengil
Represented By: William S. Kellum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Digital Course Recipe, LLC
Represented By: William S. Kellum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Credit Cake
Represented By: William S. Kellum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: John Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?