Moore v. Trans Union LLC et al
Plaintiff: Lachan Moore
Defendant: Trans Union LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Equifax Information Services LLC and Conn Appliances, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00013
Filed: January 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 7, 2023 Filing 23 NOTICE of Settlement as to Equifax Information Services, LLC by Shireen Hormozdi Bowman on behalf of Lachan Moore (Hormozdi Bowman, Shireen)
March 3, 2023 Filing 22 NOTICE of Settlement as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and Conn Appliances, Inc. by Shireen Hormozdi Bowman on behalf of Lachan Moore (Hormozdi Bowman, Shireen)
February 24, 2023 Filing 21 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Scott Harris on behalf of Equifax Information Services LLC (Harris, Andrew)
February 24, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #18 Memorandum in Support; All related filings to motion must be linked back to the original motion. Court staff has made the correction. (jla)
February 23, 2023 Filing 20 TEXT NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for 3/31/23 re #19 Order Staying Case (no document attached) (rtc)
February 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #17 MOTION to Stay. This case is STAYED pending resolution of #17 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/22/2023. (yf)
February 21, 2023 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay filed by Conn Appliances, Inc.. (Banks, James) Modified on 2/24/2023 (jla).
February 21, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay Action by Conn Appliances, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Contracts) (Banks, James)
February 21, 2023 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint by Conn Appliances, Inc.. (Banks, James)
February 17, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement as to Trans Union LLC by Shireen Hormozdi Bowman on behalf of Lachan Moore (Hormozdi Bowman, Shireen)
February 16, 2023 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE of Past Due Answer as to Trans Union LLC and Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (jla)
February 13, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re Clerk's Notice re diversity: DISREGARD Notice, Entered in Error (jla)
February 13, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE as to Equifax Information Services LLC and Conn Appliances, Inc. F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading that names and discloses the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to refile the required disclosure statement. (jla)
February 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2023 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/10/23. (rtc)
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint. Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 3/10/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/8/2023. (yf)
February 7, 2023 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Equifax Information Services LLC . (Martin, James)
February 7, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Martin, James)
February 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Conn Appliances, Inc. answer due 2/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/3/2023. (yf)
February 3, 2023 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Conn Appliances, Inc.. (Banks, James)
February 3, 2023 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Conn Appliances, Inc. . (Banks, James)
January 23, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shireen Hormozdi Bowman on behalf of Lachan Moore Conn Appliances, Inc. served on 1/17/2023. (Hormozdi Bowman, Shireen)
January 23, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shireen Hormozdi Bowman on behalf of Lachan Moore Equifax Information Services LLC served on 1/18/2023. (Hormozdi Bowman, Shireen)
January 23, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shireen Hormozdi Bowman on behalf of Lachan Moore Experian Information Solutions, Inc. served on 1/18/2023. (Hormozdi Bowman, Shireen)
January 23, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shireen Hormozdi Bowman on behalf of Lachan Moore Trans Union LLC served on 1/18/2023. (Hormozdi Bowman, Shireen)
January 17, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Emailed to attorney for service. (jwr) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/17/2023) (jwr).
January 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2191588, filed by Lachan Moore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
January 17, 2023 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Trans Union LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lachan Moore
Represented By: Shireen Hormozdi Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Andrew Scott Harris
Represented By: James Leland Martin, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conn Appliances, Inc.
Represented By: James L. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?