M&W Farms et al v. UMB Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: M&W Farms, Moore Farms Partnership, Murrah B. Hardy, Jr., T&R Farms, Berry Ann Allison, Sunnyside Planting Co., Nathan Little, Tansil Porter doing business as Porter Farms, Hubert Wolfe doing business as High Point Planting Co., V&K Farms, Edward E. Shook, Jamie Holeman, Kelsie Fennell Tribble, D&J Farms, Carty and Ashley Tillman Farms, Twin Bayou Farms and Clint Allison doing business as Clint Allison Farms
Defendant: UMB Bank, N.A. and Horne LLP
Case Number: 3:2023cv00053
Filed: March 9, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1452 Removal of Claims Related to Bankruptcy Cases
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re #22 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Corrected) filed by Berry Ann Allison, Clint Allison, Carty and Ashley Tillman Farms, D&J Farms, Murrah B. Hardy, Jr, Jamie Holeman, Nathan Little, M&W Farms, Moore Farms Partnership, Tansil Porter, Edward E. Shook, Sunnyside Planting Co., T&R Farms, Kelsie Fennell Tribble, Twin Bayou Farms, V&K Farms, Hubert Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - EGT Bankr. Hearing Tr. Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B - MDAC Hearing Tr. Excerpts) (Barrett, John)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons Issued to Horne, #4 Exhibit 4 - Summons Issued to UMB Bank, #5 Exhibit 5 - Case Filing Fee Receipt, #6 Exhibit 6 - Summons Executed on Horne, #7 Exhibit 7 - Notice of Appearance, #8 Exhibit 8 - Notice of Appearance, #9 Exhibit 9 - Notice of Appearance, #10 Exhibit 10 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #11 Exhibit 11 - State Court Docket) (Manuel, J.)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal: Attorney to file State Court Record as required by L.U.Civ.R. 5(b). (jla)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Corrected) filed by UMB Bank, N.A.. (Reed, William)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 DISREGARD ENTRY - REFILED AT DOC 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Corrected) filed by UMB Bank, N.A.. (Reed, William) Modified on 4/12/2023 (jla).
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #27 Response to #22 Motion to Remand filed by Horne LLP. (Manuel, J.) Modified on 4/13/2023 to link to motion (jwr).
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 RESPONSE to Motion re #22 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Corrected) filed by Horne LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Bankr. Doc 3105, #2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Claim) (Manuel, J.)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE re #29 Response in Opposition to Motion; Disregard docket entry - Attorney to refile. (jla)
April 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response; denying #24 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 4/5/2023. (jwr)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #24 MOTION for Reconsideration re #21 Order on Motion for Extension of Time filed by Horne LLP. (Manuel, J.)
April 4, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MOTION for Reconsideration re #21 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Horne LLP. (Manuel, J.)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #22 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Corrected) . (Barrett, John)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Corrected) by Berry Ann Allison, Clint Allison, Carty and Ashley Tillman Farms, D&J Farms, Murrah B. Hardy, Jr, Jamie Holeman, Nathan Little, M&W Farms, Moore Farms Partnership, Tansil Porter, Edward E. Shook, Sunnyside Planting Co., T&R Farms, Kelsie Fennell Tribble, Twin Bayou Farms, V&K Farms, Hubert Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bankr. Liquidation Plan, #2 Exhibit B - Bankr. Disclaimer, #3 Exhibit C - Bankr. Operating Report, #4 Exhibit D - Bankr. Disclosure Statement, #5 Exhibit E - Bankr. Order, #6 Exhibit F - Bankr. Excerpt from Claims Register) (Barrett, John)
April 3, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE re #17 Memorandum in Support, #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court ; All exhibits should be filed with the motion to which they relate and not the memorandum brief, as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2). Attorney to refile motion and memorandum brief. (jla)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer to Bankruptcy Court. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 3/30/23. (jla)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Transfer to Bankruptcy Court by UMB Bank, N.A.. (Reed, William)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer to Bankruptcy Court . (Barrett, John)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Transfer to Bankruptcy Court by Berry Ann Allison, Clint Allison, Carty and Ashley Tillman Farms, D&J Farms, Murrah B. Hardy, Jr, Jamie Holeman, Nathan Little, M&W Farms, Moore Farms Partnership, Tansil Porter, Edward E. Shook, Sunnyside Planting Co., T&R Farms, Kelsie Fennell Tribble, Twin Bayou Farms, V&K Farms, Hubert Wolfe. (Barrett, John)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Bankr. Liquidation Plan, #2 Exhibit B - Bankr. Disclaimer, #3 Exhibit C - Bankr. Operating Report, #4 Exhibit D - Bankr. Disclosure Statement, #5 Exhibit E - Bankr. Order, #6 Exhibit F - Bankr. Excerpt from Claims Register) (Barrett, John)
March 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Berry Ann Allison, Clint Allison, Carty and Ashley Tillman Farms, D&J Farms, Murrah B. Hardy, Jr, Jamie Holeman, Nathan Little, M&W Farms, Moore Farms Partnership, Tansil Porter, Edward E. Shook, Sunnyside Planting Co., T&R Farms, Kelsie Fennell Tribble, Twin Bayou Farms, V&K Farms, Hubert Wolfe. (Barrett, John)
March 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for 4/18/23 re #14 Order Staying Case (no document attached) (rtc)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER STAYING CASE pending resolution of #12 MOTION to Transfer to Bankruptcy Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/17/2023. (yf)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #12 MOTION to Transfer to Bankruptcy Court filed by Horne LLP. (Bailey, Simon)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Transfer to Bankruptcy Court by Horne LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Island Farms Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Island Farms 1st Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Island Farms Motion to Amend, #4 Exhibit 4 - Turner Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Turner Notice of Removal) (Bailey, Simon)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Horne LLP. (Bailey, Simon)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Horne LLP. (Bailey, Simon)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. (Reed, William)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by UMB Bank, N.A.. (Reed, William)
March 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Horne LLP . (Bailey, Simon)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by UMB Bank, N.A. (Supplemental). (Reed, William)
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 4/18/2023 11:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/14/23. (rtc)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by UMB Bank, N.A. . (Reed, William)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 JOINDER re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, and Supplemental Suggestions in Support of Removal. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - M & W Farms Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2- Proof of Claims, #3 Exhibit 3 - Joint Motion for Approval of Settlement and Compromise, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order Approving Settlement, #5 Exhibit 5 - BK Order Granting Motion to Amend Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - S.D. Miss. Amended Complaint, #7 Exhibit 7 - S.D. Miss. Motion to Dismiss, #8 Exhibit 8 - S.D. Miss. Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, #9 Exhibit 9 - S.D. Miss. Rebuttal in Opposition to MTD, #10 Exhibit 10 - Supplement to Motion to Approve Settlement, #11 Exhibit 11 - Bankr. Disclaiming Farmer Objection, #12 Exhibit 12 - Bankr. UMB Response to Limited Objection, #13 Exhibit 13 - Bankr. Disclaiming Farmer Sur-reply, #14 Exhibit 14 - Federal Indictment, #15 Exhibit 15 - John Coleman state indictment) (Reed, William)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sunnyside Planting Co., V&K Farms, Clint Allison, Edward E. Shook, Tansil Porter, M&W Farms, Jamie Holeman, Murrah B. Hardy, Jr, Nathan Little, Berry Ann Allison, D&J Farms, Twin Bayou Farms, Hubert Wolfe, Carty and Ashley Tillman Farms, Moore Farms Partnership, T&R Farms, Kelsie Fennell Tribble. (jla)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Horne LLP from Tallahatchie County Circuit Court, case number CV23-9SMT2. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2216398) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Horne LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - EGT Bankruptcy Petition, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons and Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Combined Horne Engagement Letters, #4 Exhibit 4 - Express Grains Amended Disclosure Statement, #5 Exhibit 5 - Settlement Order Approval, #6 Exhibit 6 - Bankruptcy Settlement Order, #7 Exhibit 7 - List of Disclaiming Farmers, #8 Exhibit 8 - Bankruptcy Proof of Claim, #9 Exhibit 9 - State Court Record, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(1) requires the filing of a corporate statement by any nongovernmental corporate party that (A) identifies any parent corporation and any publicly held corporation owning 10% or more of its stock; or (2) states that there is no such corporation. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required corporate statement. (jla)
March 9, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M&W Farms et al v. UMB Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M&W Farms
Represented By: Bryant Wandrick Clark
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: Eugene C. Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Don Barrett
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Michael T. Lewis, Sr
Represented By: Pauline Shuler Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Moore Farms Partnership
Represented By: Bryant Wandrick Clark
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Michael T. Lewis, Sr
Represented By: Pauline Shuler Lewis
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Represented By: Eugene C. Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Don Barrett
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Murrah B. Hardy, Jr.
Represented By: Bryant Wandrick Clark
Represented By: Eugene C. Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Don Barrett
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Represented By: Pauline Shuler Lewis
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Michael T. Lewis, Sr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T&R Farms
Represented By: Bryant Wandrick Clark
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Pauline Shuler Lewis
Represented By: Eugene C. Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Don Barrett
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Michael T. Lewis, Sr
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Berry Ann Allison
Represented By: Bryant Wandrick Clark
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr
Represented By: John W. Don Barrett
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Michael T. Lewis, Sr
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Represented By: Eugene C. Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Pauline Shuler Lewis
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sunnyside Planting Co.
Represented By: Bryant Wandrick Clark
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Represented By: Pauline Shuler Lewis
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Represented By: Eugene C. Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Michael T. Lewis, Sr
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr
Represented By: John W. Don Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nathan Little
Represented By: Bryant Wandrick Clark
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Eugene C. Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Don Barrett
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Michael T. Lewis, Sr
Represented By: Pauline Shuler Lewis
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tansil Porter doing business as Porter Farms
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Represented By: Bryant Wandrick Clark
Represented By: John W. Don Barrett
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Represented By: Eugene C. Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Michael T. Lewis, Sr
Represented By: Pauline Shuler Lewis
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hubert Wolfe doing business as High Point Planting Co.
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Represented By: Eugene C. Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Bryant Wandrick Clark
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr
Represented By: John W. Don Barrett
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Michael T. Lewis, Sr
Represented By: Pauline Shuler Lewis
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: V&K Farms
Represented By: Bryant Wandrick Clark
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Eugene C. Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Don Barrett
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Michael T. Lewis, Sr
Represented By: Pauline Shuler Lewis
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward E. Shook
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: Bryant Wandrick Clark
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Eugene C. Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Don Barrett
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Michael T. Lewis, Sr
Represented By: Pauline Shuler Lewis
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Holeman
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Don Barrett
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Represented By: Bryant Wandrick Clark
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Eugene C. Tanner, III
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Michael T. Lewis, Sr
Represented By: Pauline Shuler Lewis
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelsie Fennell Tribble
Represented By: Bryant Wandrick Clark
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Pauline Shuler Lewis
Represented By: Michael T. Lewis, Sr
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Represented By: Eugene C. Tanner, III
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Represented By: John W. Don Barrett
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D&J Farms
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Represented By: John W. Don Barrett
Represented By: Bryant Wandrick Clark
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Eugene C. Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: Michael T. Lewis, Sr
Represented By: Pauline Shuler Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carty and Ashley Tillman Farms
Represented By: Michael T. Lewis, Sr
Represented By: Bryant Wandrick Clark
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Don Barrett
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Eugene C. Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Pauline Shuler Lewis
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Twin Bayou Farms
Represented By: Bryant Wandrick Clark
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Eugene C. Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Don Barrett
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Michael T. Lewis, Sr
Represented By: Pauline Shuler Lewis
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Allison doing business as Clint Allison Farms
Represented By: Bryant Wandrick Clark
Represented By: Charles M. Merkel, Jr.
Represented By: David Malcolm McMullan, Jr
Represented By: Eugene C. Tanner, III
Represented By: Gerald Moses Abdalla, Jr.
Represented By: John W. Don Barrett
Represented By: John H. Cocke
Represented By: Katherine Barrett Riley
Represented By: Michael T. Lewis, Sr
Represented By: Pauline Shuler Lewis
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Aldridge
Represented By: Christopher Wayne Winter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMB Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William N. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horne LLP
Represented By: J. William Manuel
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?