GXO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc. v. Young Living Essential Oils, LC
Plaintiff: XPO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc.
Counter Defendant: GXO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc.
Counter Claimant: Young Living Essential Oils, LC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00061
Filed: March 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Waldrop, Locke)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by GXO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc.. (Waldrop, Locke)
April 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GXO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc. answer due 5/5/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/26/2023. (yf)
April 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #15 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, #22 Notice of Conventional Filing /Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Responsive Pleading to Defendant/Counter-Plaintiff's Counterclaim by GXO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc.. (Waldrop, Locke)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark A. Mattingly on behalf of GXO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc. (Mattingly, Mark)
April 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Lawrence C. Friedman on behalf of GXO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc. (Friedman, Lawrence)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kade N. Olsen on behalf of Young Living Essential Oils, LC (Olsen, Kade)
April 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey J. Hunt on behalf of Young Living Essential Oils, LC (Hunt, Jeffrey)
April 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David C. Reymann on behalf of Young Living Essential Oils, LC (Reymann, David)
April 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Mark A. Mattingly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/17/2023. (yf)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Remark; Unredacted Answer and Counterclaim received and attached to original docket entry #15 (jla)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Young Living Essential Oils, LC . (Bailey, Norman)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Answer and Counterclaim by Norman E. Bailey, Jr on behalf of Young Living Essential Oils, LC, Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Bailey, Norman)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 EXHIBIT re #20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Mark A. Mattingly,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2230457) Illinois Certificate of Good Standing. (Waldrop, Locke)
April 13, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE re #20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Mark A. Mattingly; Please file a certificate of good standing from Illinois state licensing authority by using the civil event "Exhibits to Other Documents" and linking to original motion. (jla)
April 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Mark A. Mattingly,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2230457) by GXO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc.. (Waldrop, Locke) Modified on 4/13/2023 (jla).
April 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Seal/Restrict Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/11/2023. (yf)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 5/24/2023 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/10/23. (rtc)
April 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Attorney David C. Reymann; granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Attorney Jeffrey J. Hunt; granting #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Attorney Kade N. Olsen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 4/10/2023. (yf)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION to RESTRICT document from public access #15 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim. Filed by Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Bailey, Norman)
April 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against GXO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc. by Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Bailey, Norman) (Attachment added on 4/13/2023 per #19 : #1 Unredacted Young Living Essential Oils, LC's Answer and Counterclaim) (jwr).
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Kade N. Olsen,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2228038) by Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Kade N. Olsen - New York Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Kade N. Olsen - Utah Certificate of Good Standing) (Bradley, Jacob)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Jeffrey J. Hunt,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2228002) by Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Jeffrey J. Hunt - Utah Certificate of Good Standing) (Bradley, Jacob)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney David C. Reymann,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2227995) by Young Living Essential Oils, LC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit David C. Reymann - Certificate of Good Standing) (Bradley, Jacob)
April 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jacob A. Bradley on behalf of Young Living Essential Oils, LC (Bradley, Jacob)
March 31, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Lawrence C. Friedman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/31/2023. (yf)
March 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 EXHIBIT re #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Lawrence C. Friedman,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2221933) . (Waldrop, Locke)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE re #8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Lawrence C. Friedman: Attorney to provide a certificate of good standing from each state licensing authority where admitted to practice law as required by L.U.Civ.R. 83.1(d)(4). Please use the civil event "Exhibits to Other Document" and link to the original motion. (jwr)
March 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Lawrence C. Friedman,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2221933) by GXO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Previous PHV Admissions) (Waldrop, Locke)
March 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Locke Houston Waldrop on behalf of GXO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc. Young Living Essential Oils, LC served on 3/17/2023. (Waldrop, Locke)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of Exhibit Nos. 1-6 and 9 to Plaintiff's Complaint by Locke Houston Waldrop on behalf of GXO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Sealed Exhibits List) (Waldrop, Locke)
March 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Seal/Restrict Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 3/16/2023. (yf)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to SEAL document. Filed /Motion to File Select Exhibits Under Seal by GXO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc.. (Waldrop, Locke)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by GXO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc. . (Waldrop, Locke)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Young Living Essential Oils, LC., forwarded to Attorney for service. (jla)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order CLERK'S NOTICE: Effective December 1, 2022, F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required disclosure statement. (jla)
March 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2217462, filed by GXO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GXO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc. v. Young Living Essential Oils, LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: GXO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc.
Represented By: Locke Houston Waldrop
Represented By: Lawrence C. Friedman
Represented By: Mark A. Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XPO Logistics Supply Chain, Inc.
Represented By: Locke Houston Waldrop
Represented By: Lawrence C. Friedman
Represented By: Mark A. Mattingly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Young Living Essential Oils, LC
Represented By: David C. Reymann
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Hunt
Represented By: Kade N. Olsen
Represented By: Norman E. Bailey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?