Stout v. Singh et al
Plaintiff: Angela Stout
Defendant: Kamaljit Singh, National Pride Transport Inc., John Doe Entities 1-5 and John Doe Persons 1-5
Case Number: 3:2023cv00092
Filed: April 4, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Tort/Motor Vehicle (P.I.)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Robert F. Stacy, Jr on behalf of National Pride Transport Inc., Kamaljit Singh to Plaintiff. (Stacy, Robert)
May 23, 2023 Filing 11 DISREGARD ENTRY -- REFILED AT DOC 12 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by Morgan Spivey Hart on behalf of National Pride Transport Inc., Kamaljit Singh to Plaintiff. (Hart, Morgan) Modified on 5/24/2023 (jla).
May 23, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #11 Notice of Service Pursuant to the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing, documents are to be filed only with the login credentials of signing attorney. Attorney directed to refile document with signature of filing attorney or to refile document using login credentials of signing attorney (tab)
May 22, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE by Brent Hardy Hazzard on behalf of Angela Stout Notice of Disclosure regarding diversity (Hazzard, Brent)
May 19, 2023 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kamaljit Singh . (Stacy, Robert)
May 16, 2023 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by National Pride Transport Inc. . (Stacy, Robert)
May 15, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE; Please take notice that a F.R.C.P. 7.1 disclosure statement has not been filed in this case. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required statement. (jla)
May 10, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tamara V. McGee on behalf of National Pride Transport Inc., Kamaljit Singh (McGee, Tamara)
May 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1: Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 6/6/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Confidential memos and a jointly proposed Case Management Order due no later than 5/23/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 5/9/23. (irw)
May 8, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by National Pride Transport Inc.. (Stacy, Robert)
May 8, 2023 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Kamaljit Singh. (Stacy, Robert)
May 4, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert F. Stacy, Jr on behalf of National Pride Transport Inc., Kamaljit Singh (Stacy, Robert)
April 4, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to National Pride Transport Inc., Kamaljit Singh; emailed to Attorney for service. (jla)
April 4, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2226657, filed by Angela Stout. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
April 4, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: Effective December 1, 2022, F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required disclosure statement. (jla)
April 4, 2023 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stout v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angela Stout
Represented By: Brent Hardy Hazzard
Represented By: Emily Clair Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamaljit Singh
Represented By: Robert F. Stacy, Jr.
Represented By: Morgan Spivey Hart
Represented By: Tamara V. McGee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Pride Transport Inc.
Represented By: Morgan Spivey Hart
Represented By: Tamara V. McGee
Represented By: Robert F. Stacy, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Entities 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Persons 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?