Strong v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Plaintiff: Alicia Strong
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP and Wal-Mart, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00148
Filed: May 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Sharion Aycock
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice by reason of settlement. This CASE is CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/15/2023. (tjw)
June 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/15/23. (rtc)
June 15, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2024 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
June 13, 2023 Filing 16 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. to Plaintiff. (Louis, Thomas)
June 13, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE OF SERVICE of First Set of Interrogatories by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. to Plaintiff. (Louis, Thomas)
June 12, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 7/15/2024 09:40 AM in Oxford Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (tjw)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER regarding settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/12/23. (rtc)
June 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/10/2024 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before District Judge Sharion Aycock. Discovery due by 12/11/2023. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 7/12/2023. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 9/11/2023. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 10/11/2023. Motions due by 1/5/2024. Settlement Conference set for 10/18/2023 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/12/23. (rtc)
June 12, 2023 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 6/12/2023. (rtc)
June 6, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Pre-Discovery Disclosures by Dillard Dee Melton, III on behalf of Alicia Strong to Counsel for Defendant. (Melton, Dillard)
June 5, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 6/12/2023 10:30 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. CHANGE IN TIME ONLY. (rtc)
June 5, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Walmart's Pre-Discovery Disclosures of Core Information by Rajita Iyer Moss on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. to Counsel for Plaintiff. (Moss, Rajita)
May 23, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Walmart's Responses to Requests for Admission by Thomas M. Louis on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. to Plaintiff. (Louis, Thomas)
May 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 6/12/2023 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/17/23. (rtc)
May 17, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc.. (Louis, Thomas)
May 10, 2023 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Docket Page, #2 Complaint for Damages #1 , #3 Civil Cover Sheet #2 , #4 Summons Issued to Wal-Mart Stores East #3 , #5 Summons Issued to Wal-Mart Inc. #4 ) (Moss, Rajita)
May 10, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc. (Corporate). (Moss, Rajita)
May 10, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Wal-Mart, Inc., filed by Alicia Strong. (jla)
May 10, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP from Desoto County Circuit Court, case number CI2023-045GCD. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2242419) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Wal-Mart, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - SOP Transmittal, #3 Exhibit C - Copies of Process, Pleadings served on Walmart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
May 10, 2023 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strong v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Strong
Represented By: Dillard Dee Melton, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Rajita Iyer Moss
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart, Inc.
Represented By: Rajita Iyer Moss
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?