Hunsucker v. Resurgent Capital Services L.P.
Plaintiff: Jimmy D. Hunsucker
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services L.P. doing business as LVNV Funding, LLC, Resurgent Capital Services L.P. and LVNV Funding, LLC
Case Number: 3:2023cv00162
Filed: May 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2023 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants,, filed by Jimmy D. Hunsucker. (Ware, Daniel)
July 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 7/5/23. (bnd)
June 28, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE OF SERVICE of LVNV Funding, LLC's Initial Disclosures by R. Frank Springfield on behalf of Resurgent Capital Services L.P. to Plaintiff. (Springfield, R.)
June 28, 2023 Filing 19 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Daniel D. Ware on behalf of Jimmy D. Hunsucker to Defendant. (Ware, Daniel)
June 23, 2023 Filing 18 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Status Conference held on 6/23/2023. (rtc)
June 21, 2023 Filing 17 NOTICE of Conference: Status Conference set for 6/23/2023 02:00 PM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
June 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/20/23. (rtc)
June 20, 2023 Filing 15 NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/25/2024 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
June 19, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Jimmy D. Hunsucker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Complaint) (Ware, Daniel)
June 15, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 4/29/2024 09:45 AM in Greenville Courtroom 1 before District Judge Debra M. Brown. (lld)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER regarding settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/14/23. (rtc)
June 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/25/2024 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 12/12/2023. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 7/14/2023. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 9/12/2023. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 10/12/2023. Motions due by 1/5/2024. Settlement Conference set for 11/29/2023 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/14/23. (rtc)
June 14, 2023 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 6/14/2023. (rtc)
June 7, 2023 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Resurgent Capital Services L.P. . (Springfield, R.)
June 5, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 6/14/2023 10:30 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. CHANGE IN TIME ONLY. (rtc)
June 1, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 MOTION to Extend CMO Deadlines (Unopposed); In the future, proposed orders should be emailed directly to chambers as required by Section 5(B) of the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. (jla)
May 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for extension of time to submit Case Management Order and Confidential Settlement Memo. 7 day extension of time granted. No further order will be entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/23/23. (bnd)
May 23, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend CMO Deadlines (Unopposed) by Resurgent Capital Services L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Springfield, R.)
May 19, 2023 Filing 5 ANSWER to State Court Complaint by Resurgent Capital Services L.P.. (Springfield, R.)
May 19, 2023 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Summons Issued, #3 Exhibit 3 - Summons Executed, #4 Exhibit 4- Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Springfield, R.)
May 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2023 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 5/18/23. (rtc)
May 17, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Resurgent Capital Services L.P., filed by Jimmy D. Hunsucker. (jwr)
May 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Resurgent Capital Services L.P. from Circuit Court of Benton County, Mississippi, case number B2023-030. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2245722) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Resurgent Capital Services L.P. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (jwr)
May 17, 2023 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jwr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunsucker v. Resurgent Capital Services L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy D. Hunsucker
Represented By: Daniel D. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services L.P. doing business as LVNV Funding, LLC
Represented By: R. Frank Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Resurgent Capital Services L.P.
Represented By: R. Frank Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVNV Funding, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?