Nicholas Services, LLC v. AeroElite Interiors Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Nicholas Services, LLC
Defendant: AeroElite Interiors Corp., Airtech of Ohio, LLC and East Coast Aircraft Painting, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2023cv00390
Filed: October 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Michael P Mills
Referring Judge: Jane M Virden
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 12/21/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 12/11/2023. (bbf)
December 7, 2023 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT FIRST against All Defendants, Jury Demand, filed by Nicholas Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Toms, Christopher)
November 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE for failure to properly allege citizenship. Show Cause Response due by 12/8/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 11/28/2023. (bbf)
November 15, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to AeroElite Interiors Corp., Airtech of Ohio, LLC, and East Coast Aircraft Painting, Inc. (jla)
October 13, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nicholas Services, LLC . (Toms, Christopher)
October 13, 2023 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to AeroElite Interiors Corp., Airtech of Ohio, LLC, East Coast Aircraft Painting, Inc.. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (jla)
October 13, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC2307618, filed by Nicholas Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)
October 13, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE: F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required disclosure statement. (jla)
October 13, 2023 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Mills and Magistrate Judge Virden. (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nicholas Services, LLC v. AeroElite Interiors Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Services, LLC
Represented By: Hannah Katherine Herrin
Represented By: Christopher Ryan Toms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AeroElite Interiors Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Airtech of Ohio, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Coast Aircraft Painting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?