Glaser v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, et al
Plaintiff: Rena Drew Glaser
Defendant: Walmart, Inc., Randy McCoy, John Doe Corporations 1-5, John Does 1-5 and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 3:2023cv00429
Filed: November 13, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Mississippi
Presiding Judge: Debra M Brown
Referring Judge: Michael P Mills
2 Judge: Roy Percy
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court ; Responses due by 1/18/2024. Signed by Senior Judge Michael P. Mills on 1/10/24. (jla)
January 10, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court (Unopposed) by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Moss, Rajita)
January 2, 2024 Filing 17 TEXT NOTICE Cancelling Case Management Conference set for 1/31/24 re #16 Order Staying Case (no document attached) (rtc)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER STAYING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/2/24. (rrh)
December 28, 2023 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #14 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Rena Drew Glaser. (Bass, Yeager)
December 28, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Rena Drew Glaser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint) (Bass, Yeager)
December 26, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #13 Memorandum in Support: All exhibits should be filed with the motion to which they relate and not the memorandum brief, as required by L.U.Civ.R. 7(b)(2). Further, all exhibits must be clearly identified with an exhibit letter or number and a meaningful description. Attorney to refile motion and memorandum brief. (jwr)
December 22, 2023 Filing 13 DISREGARD ENTRY - ATTORNEY DIRECTED TO REFILE MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #12 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Rena Drew Glaser. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Bass, Yeager) Modified on 12/26/2023 (jwr).
December 22, 2023 Filing 12 DISREGARD ENTRY - ATTORNEY DIRECTED TO REFILE MOTION to Remand to State Court by Rena Drew Glaser. (Bass, Yeager) Modified on 12/26/2023 (jwr).
December 19, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Conference: Case Management Conference reset for 1/31/2024 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
December 19, 2023 Filing 10 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Status Conference held on 12/19/2023. (rtc)
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Substituting Party. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP added. Walmart, Inc. terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/19/2023. (jwr)
December 12, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Pre-Discovery Disclosures of Core Information by Rajita Iyer Moss on behalf of Randy McCoy, Walmart, Inc. to Counsel for Plaintiff. (Moss, Rajita)
November 14, 2023 Filing 7 ANSWER to State Court Complaint with Jury Demand by Randy McCoy, Walmart, Inc.; filed in State Court, see doc #4 . (jla)
November 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Debra M. Brown recused. Case reassigned to Senior Judge Michael P. Mills for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Debra M. Brown on 11/14/2023. (lgm)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 12/19/2023 11:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 11/13/23. (rtc)
November 13, 2023 Filing 4 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Docket Page, #2 Civil Cover Sheet #2 , #3 Complaint #3 , #4 Summons Issued to Randy McCoy #4 , #5 Summons Issued to Walmart #5 , #6 Summons Return as to Walmart #6 , #7 Summons Return as to Randy McCoy #7 , #8 Answer and Defenses of Walmart and Randy McCoy #8 , #9 Walmart's Notice of Service - First INT, RFP & RFA to PL #9 , #10 PL's Notice of Service - RFA Responses #10 , #11 Walmart's Notice of Service - RFA Responses #11 ) (Moss, Rajita)
November 13, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Walmart, Inc. . (Moss, Rajita)
November 13, 2023 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (lgm)
November 13, 2023 CLERK'S NOTICE F.R.C.P. 7.1(a)(2) requires all parties in a diversity action to file a disclosure statement at the time of the initial appearance and/or pleading. The disclosure statement must name and disclose the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party. Please use the civil event Disclosure Statement to file the required disclosure statement. (lgm)
November 10, 2023 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against John Doe Corporations 1-5, John Does 1-5, Randy McCoy, Walmart, Inc., filed by Rena Drew Glaser. (lgm) Modified on 11/13/2023 (lgm).
November 10, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc. from Circuit Court of Tate County, Mississippi, case number 23-cv-286-SWT. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMSNDC-2320683) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally. filed by Walmart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - PL's Responses to RFA, #3 Exhibit C - Copies of process, pleadings served on Walmart, #4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Randy McCoy, #5 Exhibit E - Answer and Defenses of Walmart and Randy McCoy, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 State Court Complaint, #8 Exhibit Answer to State Court Complaint) (lgm) Modified on 11/13/2023 (lgm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Mississippi Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glaser v. Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rena Drew Glaser
Represented By: Yeager Matthews Bass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Represented By: Rajita Iyer Moss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy McCoy
Represented By: Rajita Iyer Moss
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Rajita Iyer Moss
Represented By: Thomas M. Louis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?